Cleary v. Retirement Plan for Employees of Northern Montana Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Joel Cleary
Defendant: Retirement Plan for Employees of Northern Montana Hospital, Administrative Committee of the Retirement Plan for Employees of Northern Montana Hospital, Northern Montana Hospital, David C. Henry, Kim Lucke and Bonnie O'Neill
Case Number: 4:2016cv00061
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: HILL
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Judgment is entered as outlined in the Court's Final Order and Judgment, Document 161 . Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2018. (MMS)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2018. (MMS)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: The deadline for submission of the Settlement Agreement and Proposed Order is July 30, 2018, and the deadline for the payment to Plaintiff is August 8, 2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/19/2018. (MMS)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 124 Motion to File Under Seal. Defendants' Response Brief and its attached Exhibits shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/13/2018. (MMS)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 101 Motion to File Under Seal Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Second Motion To Supplement the Record on Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Third Statement of Disputed Facts, and Exhibits 4 and 5. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/11/2018. (MMS)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 89 Motion to Vacate Remaining Case Deadlines Pending Outcome of Mediation. All remaining case deadlines in this case shall be vacated. The Parties shall submit a status report to the Court within 14 days after that mediation, reporting on the outcome and providing a proposal for how the case should proceed. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/2/2017. (MMS)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER: The Court conducted a hearing on all pending motions in this matter of September 13, 2017. For the reasons discussed in open court, IT IS ORDERED: 50 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED; 56 Motion for Mediatio n is GRANTED; 67 Motion to Supplement the Record on Summary Judgment is GRANTED; 30 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED with respect to the claims asserted in Counts 3,4 and 5 of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. The portion of Defendants' Motion for Summary judgment that addressed Counts 1 and 2 of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is taken under advisement. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/14/2017. (MMS)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 62 Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery 63 and Exhibits 3 and 4 shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/9/2017. (MMS)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROTECTIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(c) that any disclosures occurring by Mercer in the above-captioned case shall be conducted under the following terms: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/11/2017. (SLR)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Based upon the 33 unopposed motion of Defendants, and for good cause appearing therefore; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's time within which to file papers in opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 30 ) i s extended to two (2) weeks after Defendants have served their response and produced documents in response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents, which are due to be served no later than October 17, 2016 Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/19/2016. (SLR, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleary v. Retirement Plan for Employees of Northern Montana Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Cleary
Represented By: David S. Preminger
Represented By: Havila C. Unrein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Retirement Plan for Employees of Northern Montana Hospital
Represented By: Steven R. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Committee of the Retirement Plan for Employees of Northern Montana Hospital
Represented By: Steven R. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Montana Hospital
Represented By: Steven R. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David C. Henry
Represented By: Steven R. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Lucke
Represented By: Steven R. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie O'Neill
Represented By: Steven R. Milch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?