Great Western Bank v. Pro Tank Products et al
Plaintiff: Great Western Bank
Defendant: Pro Tank Products, Todd J. Marsh, Marsh Land and Livestock, Stockman Bank of Montana, Scottrade Financial Services, Rabo Agrifinance and Farm Credit Services of America
Case Number: 4:2016cv00094
Filed: August 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: SHERIDAN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 JUDGMENT in favor of Great Western Bank against Pro Tank Products, Todd J. Marsh, Motions terminated: 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Great Western Bank. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/30/2017. (See Order for full details) (TLO)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Pretrial Motion Deadline. The Pretrial Motion Deadline of July 21, 2017 is EXTENDED until August 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/17/2017. (MMS)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear By Telephone. Gary Deschenes, counsel for the Defendants, Pro Tank Products, Inc. and Todd Marsh, shall be allowed to appear at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for December 1, 2016, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. The Court will inform the Defendants', Pro Tank Products, Inc. and Todd J. Marsh, counsel of the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/16/2016. (MMS, )
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2016 is RESET for 12/1/2016 at 11:00 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2016. (MMS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Western Bank v. Pro Tank Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Western Bank
Represented By: Charles W. Hingle
Represented By: Steven Thomas Small
Represented By: Michelle Millhollin Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Tank Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd J. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh Land and Livestock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockman Bank of Montana
Represented By: William D. Lamdin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottrade Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabo Agrifinance
Represented By: Alan C. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Credit Services of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?