Wallace v. United States A.A. Office et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Wallace
Defendant: United States A.A. Office, B.I.A. Corrections Personnel, U.S. B.O.P. and Montana State Prison Infirmary
Case Number: 4:2016cv00101
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Wallace. (TAG)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ; adopting 5 Findings and Recommendations; denying 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Wallace must pay the full filing fee of $400.00 within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Complaint shall be DISMISSED and the Clerk of Court shall close the case and enter judgment if the filing fee is not received within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/16/2016. Mailed to Wallace. (TAG, )
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gregory Lynn Wallace. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/15/2016. Mailed to Wallace. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. United States A.A. Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Lynn Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States A.A. Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.I.A. Corrections Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. B.O.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana State Prison Infirmary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?