Lodgepole v. Nault et al

Plaintiff: Leslie Young Lodgepole
Defendant: Emery Nault, Lenore Meyers and Gloria Little
Case Number: 4:2016cv00110
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CHOUTEAU
Referring Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 23 Findings and Recommendations. Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Entry of Default, construed as a motion to set aside default 22 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Entry of Default Judgment 18 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Second Amended Motion for Entry of Default Judgment 21 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/13/2018. (Copy of order mailed to Lodgepole) (MMS)
March 5, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Letter. Mr. Lodge Pole's motion to vacate the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is DENIED, denied because he failed to contact opposing counsel in relation to this motion and he failed to set forth good cause for seeking this confe rence to be vacated. Therefore, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference will be held on March 7, 2018, as previously ordered. Mr. Lodge Pole's failure to file a Preliminary Pretrial Statement will be addressed at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 3/5/2018. (MMS) Modified on 3/5/2018 to reflect parties were contacted by phone informing them of this order, also a copy of the order was mailed to Mr. Lodge Pole (MMS).
February 27, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Letter: On February 9, 2018, the Court received a letter, construed as a motion for extension of time. Plaintiff is seeking an extension of time to file his preliminary pretrial statement, statement of stipulated facts and joint disco very plan. Plaintiff is also asking that the preliminary pretrial conference scheduled for March 7, 2018 be vacated and reset. Plaintiff did not state in his motion if the Defendants oppose this motion. According, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants will file their response brief to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time on or before March 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 2/27/2018. (Copy of order mailed to Lodgepole) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lodgepole v. Nault et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Young Lodgepole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emery Nault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenore Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?