Gallardo Thunder Hawk v. 2 USM's Names Unknown
Plaintiff: Frank Gallardo Thunder Hawk
Defendant: 2 USM's Names Unknown
Case Number: 4:2017cv00004
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's motion for court order 37 as construed as a motion to compel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Plaintiff's motion for certificate of appealability 38 as construed as a motion for interlocutory appeal is DENIED. Copy of order mailed to Plt along with a blank subpoena form. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/14/2017. (ACC)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER. FTCA claims DISMISSED for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. United States Dismissed. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/19/2017. Mailed to Gallardo (TAG)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 10 in full. Defendant Dana Rossmiller and Defendant State of Montana are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/31/2017. Mailed to Gallardo. (TAG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallardo Thunder Hawk v. 2 USM's Names Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gallardo Thunder Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 USM's Names Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?