Stenzel v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Jay Stenzel
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Does 1 through 5
Case Number: 4:2017cv00027
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Upon Stipulation of the parties, and good cause being shown; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above case is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. All deadlines and hearings are vacated. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/4/2018. (SLR)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: The Court has been informed that this case has settled at a settlement conference conducted by United States Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on April 16, 2018. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all hearings and deadlines in the case are VACATED. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit to the undersigned a proposed order of dismissal on or before May 16, 2018, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/16/2018. (MMS)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: re 13 Motion to Set Aside Default is GRANTED; 19 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 7/17/2017. (ACC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stenzel v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Stenzel
Represented By: Charles S. Lucero
Represented By: Curtis G. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Shane Coleman
Represented By: Brian M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?