Northern Plains Resource Council et al v. Shannon et al
Case Number: 4:2017cv00031
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: PHILLIPS
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER ENTERING STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ON PLAINTIFFS NORTHERN PLAINS RESOURCE COUNCIL ET AL.'S AMENDED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS re 291 Stipulated Motion filed by Ryan Zinke, United States Department of State, Bureau of Land Management, Thomas A. Shannon, Jr., U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior. Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, 274 is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction of this matter solely for purposes of enforcing the Stipulated Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/26/2020. (MMS)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting 284 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aaron Colangelo. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/24/2020. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/9/2020. (Copy mailed to counsel Colangelo) (MMS)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO STAY. TransCanada's Motion to Stay the application of the permanent injunction with respect to its right to engage in the three proposed off-right-of-way activities is GRANTED IN PART, AND DENIED IN PART. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/15/2019. (SLR)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 59 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 61 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/22/2017. (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Plains Resource Council et al v. Shannon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?