Broadway v. Meek et al
Plaintiff: David Broadway
Defendant: Kari Ann Meek and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2017cv00033
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The Court has been informed that this case has settled at a settlement conference held on February 20, 2018. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all deadlines in the case are VACATED and all motions terminated. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit to the undersigned a proposed order of dismissal on or before March 20, 2018, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/20/2018. (MMS)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER; Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 29 is GRANTED. Montana law will govern the interpretation of the Allstate policy in this case. Allstates Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 23 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/5/2017. (TLO)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 8 Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/18/2017. (ACC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadway v. Meek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Broadway
Represented By: Joseph C. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kari Ann Meek
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Represented By: Gregory G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie A. Oblander
Represented By: Gregory G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?