State of New Mexico et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Plaintiff: State of California, State of New Mexico, State of New York and State of Washington
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior, Ryan Zinke and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 4:2017cv00042
Filed: May 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs requested relief in their Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 115, 117) and Briefs on Remedies (Docs. 147, 153) is DENIED. (SLR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 34 Motion to Intervene regarding the State of Wyoming. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/25/2017. (MMS)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bill Grantham for Plaintiffs. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/5/2017. (Copy mailed to counsel Grantham) (MMS)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved for admission of Elizabeth Rumsey to appear pro hac vice in this case with Roger M. Sullivan, of McGarvey, Heberling, Sullivan & Lacey, P.C. to act as local counsel. Ms. Rumseys application appears to be in compliance wit h L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED, subject to the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2017. (ACC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New Mexico et al v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Yueh-ru Chu
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: Dustin A. Leftridge
Represented By: Liz Rumsey
Represented By: William R. Sherman
Represented By: Roger M. Sullivan
Represented By: George Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Represented By: Yueh-ru Chu
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: Dustin A. Leftridge
Represented By: Liz Rumsey
Represented By: William R. Sherman
Represented By: Roger M. Sullivan
Represented By: George Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Yueh-ru Chu
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: Dustin A. Leftridge
Represented By: Liz Rumsey
Represented By: William R. Sherman
Represented By: Roger M. Sullivan
Represented By: George Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Yueh-ru Chu
Represented By: William G. Grantham
Represented By: Dustin A. Leftridge
Represented By: Liz Rumsey
Represented By: William R. Sherman
Represented By: Roger M. Sullivan
Represented By: George Torgun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?