Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Think Finance

Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Defendant: Think Finance
Case Number: 4:2017cv00127
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: CASCADE
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER; Pursuant to the Parties Joint Motion to Stay 97 , filed on April 25, 2019, the Court stays this case including all case deadlines. The stay will terminate upon: 1) A joint motion by the parties for entry of a proposed Consent Order resolvin g this litigation; 2) A motion by either party if Defendants fail to confirm a plan of reorganization or seek to confirm a plan to which the Bureau does not agree in the Defendants bankruptcy proceeding, In re: Think Finance, LLC, et al., Bankr. N.D. Tex. 17-33964-hdh-11; or 3) A motion by either party upon other good cause shown. The parties shall file status reports with the Court every 60 days until the stay terminates. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/30/2019. (TLO)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven Ellis ; granting 83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy Lateiner. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/27/2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/12/2018. (Copy of order mailed to PHV counsel) (MMS)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 50 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/3/2018. (SLR)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Rosenberg ; granting 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Sheldon. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/13/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/26/2018. (Copy of order mailed to counsel) (MMS)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 4 Motion to Change Venue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the undersigned will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on Tuesday, February 13, at 3:30 p.m. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/6/2018. (TLO)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas M. Hefferon for Think Finance. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/18/2018. (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Think Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Vanessa Buchko
Represented By: Benjamin Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Think Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?