Wildearth Guardians et al v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management et al
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians, Montana Environmental Information Center, David Katz, Bonnie Martinell and Jack Martinell
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management, Ryan Zinke and Donato Judice
Case Number: 4:2018cv00073
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: GLACIER
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (MMS)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 1 Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. The Court VACATES the findings of no significant impact; The Court VACATES the leases; and The Court REMANDS this matter to BLM for further analysis, consistent with the Court's discussion above, of the environmental impacts of the decision to grant the leases at issue. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/1/2020. (MMS)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joel Miner for David Katz,Joel Miner for Bonnie Martinell,Joel Miner for Jack Martinell,Joel Miner for Montana Environmental Information Center,Joel Miner for Wildearth Guardians. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/22/2019. (Copy of order mailed to counsel Miner) (MMS)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: A hearing on the parties' cross motions for summary judgment will be held on 6/26/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/3/2018. (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wildearth Guardians et al v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katz
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Martinell
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Martinell
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Laura King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donato Judice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?