English v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Francis E. English
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Christopher Parker and Christopher Groeling
Case Number: 4:2018cv00077
Filed: May 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: HILL
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting 243 Motion for Bond. A Supersedeas Bond in the amount of $299,291.00 is APPROVED and the proceedings to enforce judgment are STAYED pending resolution of the appeal to the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/27/2021. (MMS)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER re 230 MOTION to Amend/Correct 226 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/30/2021. (ACC)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Francis E. English against BNSF Railway Company. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/9/2021. (SLR)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/5/2020. (SLR)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER; BNSFs Motion for Reconsideration of Summary Judgment on Preemption 116 is DENIED; BNSFs Motion for Summary Judgment 118 is DENIED; Englishs Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for Relief for Failure to supplement 122 is DENIED; Englishs Motion for Sanctions 128 is DENIED; BNSFS Motion in Limine 130 is DENIED without prejudice; Englishs Motion to Defer Ruling on BNSF Motion for Summary Judgment 141 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/20/2020. (TLO)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Motion to Conduct Hearing by Video. The motion hearing will be conducted by ZOOM. The Court will provide the parties with the Zoom link. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/13/2020. (MMS)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 125 Motion for Leave to Appear. Plaintiff has moved to alter the attendance requirements for the trial due to the Covid-19 pandemic, Co-counsel Scott Peterson, legal assistance Elayne Simmons and the plaintiff will attend the trial live. Due to the Covid-19 risks, however, plaintiff's counsel Erik Thueson is given the option to attend by video conference means. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/8/2020. (MMS)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Compel. BNSF is directed to produce, or before June 19, 2020, all BST Organizational Cultural Assessments relating to the Northwest Division and the Twin Cities Division date January 1, 2009, through December 31, 2017. The BST Organizational Cultural Assessments are relevant and proportional to the needs of the case. English's request for sanctions, attorneys' fees, and costs, is DENIED. The parties had a good-faith misunderstanding regarding Judge Morris's instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 6/10/2020. (MMS)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 90 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/1/2020. (MMS)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 63 Motion for Protective Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/15/2019. (MMS)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have the opportunity to conduct a telephonic deposition of Defendant Parker to determine whether his domicile has changed. The parties are requested to complete the deposition on or before October 1, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit a short brief and a copy of the deposition setting forth his position within fourteen days of the Parker deposition. If necessary, the defendants shall than respond within the time limits provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2018. (MMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: English v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis E. English
Represented By: Erik B. Thueson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Jared Frickle
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Groeling
Represented By: Jared Frickle
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?