Bold et al v. Crop Production Services et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Bold, Alexandra Bold, Robert Bold, Annette Bold, Regan Bold and X Hanging Diamond Ranch
Defendant: Crop Production Services, Loveland Products and Nutrien Ag Solutions
Case Number: 4:2018cv00109
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
County: FERGUS
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Bold. Loveland Products waiver sent on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Evenson, Kirk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Bold. Nutrien Ag Solutions waiver sent on 8/30/2018, answer due 10/29/2018. (Evenson, Kirk)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED Summons Issued as to Loveland Products, Inc. and Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., f/k/a Crop Production Services, Inc. Original issued Amended Summonses mailed to Counsel Evenson. (SLR)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Robert Bold et al against All Defendants, filed by Spencer Bold, Annette Bold, Robert Bold, Alexandra Bold, Regan Bold. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons - Nutrien Ag Solutions Inc. fka Crop Production Services Inc., #2 Amended Summons - Loveland Productions Inc.) (Evenson, Kirk)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Crop Production Services, Loveland Products. Originals mailed to Cnsl Evenson (ACC)
August 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2175501 (ACC)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crop Production Services, Loveland Products, filed by Robert Bold, Annette Bold, Spencer Bold, X Hanging Diamond Ranch, Regan Bold, Alexandra Bold. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bold et al v. Crop Production Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Bold
Represented By: Nicole F. Morton
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Bold
Represented By: Nicole F. Morton
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bold
Represented By: Nicole F. Morton
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Bold
Represented By: Nicole F. Morton
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regan Bold
Represented By: Nicole F. Morton
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X Hanging Diamond Ranch
Represented By: Nicole F. Morton
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crop Production Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loveland Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutrien Ag Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?