Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan et al v. Gary and Leo's, Inc

Plaintiff: Danny Ma, Nicolai Cocergine, Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan and Montana Retail Store Employees Health & Welfare Trust
Defendant: Gary and Leo's, Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00114
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Montana District Court
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 15 MOTION David Riewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2216229.) Jean E. Faure appearing for Defendant Gary and Leo's, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David Riewald) (Faure, Jean)
October 29, 2018 14 MOTION Dennis Westlind to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2216203.) Jean E. Faure appearing for Defendant Gary and Leo's, Inc (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dennis Westlind) (Faure, Jean)
October 17, 2018 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Nicolai Cocergine, Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan, Danny Ma, Montana Retail Store Employees Health & Welfare Trust re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Mason, L.)
October 17, 2018 12 Remark: Attorney L. Katie Mason is now a registered user. (MMS)
October 10, 2018 11 Featured Case PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: Parties shall appear before the undersigned on November 13, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana, for the purpose of participating in a preliminary pretrial conference (conference). The parties should report to the chambers of the undersigned for the conference. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 11/6/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 11/6/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/10/2018. (ACC)
October 9, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gary and Leo's, Inc. (Faure, Jean)
October 9, 2018 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Nicolai Cocergine, Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan, Danny Ma, Montana Retail Store Employees Health & Welfare Trust re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, Attorney Malinda J. Eskra's Acknowledgement and Acceptance of Admission Pro Hac Vice (Eskra, Malinda)
October 9, 2018 Remark: Pro Hac Vice Attorney Malinda Eskra is now a registered CM/ECF user. (SLR)
October 4, 2018 8 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Malinda Eskra re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Eskra. (ACC)
October 4, 2018 7 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel L. Katie Mason re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Mason. (ACC)
October 4, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved for an order allowing L. Katie Mason, Esq. and Malinda Eskra, Esq. to appear pro hac vice in this case with Benjamin C. Burns, Esq., designated as local counsel. The applications of Ms. Mason and Ms. Eskra appear to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' #4 and #5 motions to allow Ms. Mason and Ms. Eskra to appear on their behalf are GRANTED on the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (ACC)
September 19, 2018 5 MOTION Malinda Eskra to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2197152.) Benjamin C. Burns appearing for Plaintiff Danny Ma (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Burns, Benjamin)
September 19, 2018 4 MOTION L. Katie Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2197145.) Benjamin C. Burns appearing for Plaintiff Danny Ma (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Burns, Benjamin)
September 19, 2018 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Defendant, Acknowledgement filed by Danny Ma. (Burns, Benjamin)
August 31, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Gary and Leo's, Inc. (Original mailed to counsel) (MMS)
August 31, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2188253 (MMS)
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Gary and Leo's, Inc, filed by Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan, Nicolai Cocergine, Danny Ma, Montana Retail Store Employees Health & Welfare Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan et al v. Gary and Leo's, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary and Leo's, Inc
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Ma
Represented By: Benjamin C. Burns
Represented By: Gregory J. Hatley
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Represented By: L. Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolai Cocergine
Represented By: Benjamin C. Burns
Represented By: Gregory J. Hatley
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Represented By: L. Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intermountain Retail Store Employees Pension Plan
Represented By: Benjamin C. Burns
Represented By: Gregory J. Hatley
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Represented By: L. Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Retail Store Employees Health & Welfare Trust
Represented By: Benjamin C. Burns
Represented By: Gregory J. Hatley
Represented By: Malinda J. Eskra
Represented By: L. Katie Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?