Waldenberg v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Nancy Waldenberg
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00116
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Nancy Waldenberg. (Sherwood, Frederick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Nancy Waldenberg. (Sherwood, Frederick)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone. ALL PARTIES will appear by telephone for the November 7, 2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The Court will contact the parties with the call in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/17/2018. (MMS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Nancy Waldenberg. (Sherwood, Frederick)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Preliminary Pretrial Conference By Telephone Michelle L. Gomez appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Gomez, Michelle)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set for 11/7/2018 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (SLL)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of the 10/24/2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The 10/24/2018 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is hereby vacated, and will be rescheduled by the Court. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (TLO)
September 13, 2018 Remark; Attorney Anne Sherwood is now a registered user (TLO)
September 13, 2018 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on shelf in Great Falls Clerk's Office. (ACC)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Nancy Waldenberg. (ACC)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 State Court Issued Summons, #4 Summons Returned Served) (ACC)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #5 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, Michelle L. Gomez appearing for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gomez, Michelle)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/17/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/17/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/17/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/12/2018. (ACC)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Anne Sherwood re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Sherwood. (SLR)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Gomez, Michelle)
September 5, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2189976 (TLO)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. from Montana Eighth Judicial District, case number BDV-18-0321., filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waldenberg v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michelle L. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Waldenberg
Represented By: Anne E. Sherwood
Represented By: Frederick F. Sherwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?