Hill v. LLR et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Hill
Defendant: LULAROE and LLR
Case Number: 4:2018cv00120
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah C Lynch
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 35 Notice of Correction: re #34 Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order. The filing error relates to: Signature and Login Do not Match. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
November 30, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by LLR, LULAROE re #26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Roth, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/29/2018. (TXB)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike Responses due by 12/7/2018. Replies due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremiah C. Lynch on 11/29/2018. (TXB)
November 29, 2018 Remark; Attorneys Steven T. Graham and Randolph T. Moore are now registered e-filers (TLO)
November 28, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by LLR, LULAROE re #26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Oven, Jeffery)
November 28, 2018 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Strike Kelly Iverson appearing for Plaintiff Melissa Hill Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Iverson, Kelly)
November 28, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Kelly Iverson appearing for Plaintiff Melissa Hill Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Iverson, Kelly)
November 19, 2018 Filing 28 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Steven T. Graham re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Graham. (ACC)
November 19, 2018 Filing 27 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Randolph T. Moore re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Moore. (ACC)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: Defendants have moved for an order allowing Randall T. Moore, Esq. and Steven T. Graham, Esq. to appear pro hac vice in this case with Jeffrey M. Roth, Esq., designated as local counsel. The applications of Mr. Moore and Mr. Graham appear to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's motions to allow #25 Mr. Moore and #24 Mr. Graham to appear on it's behalf are GRANTED, subject to conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/19/2018. (ACC)
November 19, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION Steven T. Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2225154.) Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Defendants LLR, LULAROE Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Roth, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION Randolph T. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2225145.) Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Defendants LLR, LULAROE Motions referred to Jeremiah C. Lynch. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Roth, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' #19 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) and (b)(6), and Motion to Strike Class Allegations Pursuant to FRCP 112(f) and 23(d)(1)(D) is referred to Magistrate Judge Jeremiah Lynch. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2018. Order emailed to JCL Chambers. (SLR)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by LLR, LULAROE re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Oven, Jeffery)
November 14, 2018 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Jamie Ellis by LLR, LULAROE re #19 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Oven, Jeffery) Modified on 11/14/2018 to link back to Motion. (SLR).
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LLR, LULAROE. (Oven, Jeffery)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Strike Jeffery J. Oven appearing for Defendants LLR, LULAROE (Oven, Jeffery). Added MOTION to Strike on 11/14/2018 (SLR). Modified on 11/15/2018 to clean up text. (SLR).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may use up to 10,000 words. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2018. (MMS)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Defendants LLR, LULAROE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Roth, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Melissa Hill re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, (Tucker, Kevin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Melissa Hill re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, (Iverson, Kelly)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Melissa Hill re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, (Carlson, R.)
October 29, 2018 Remark: Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bruce Carlson, Kelly Iverson and Kevin Tucker are now registered CM/ECF users. (ACC)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Kevin Tucker re CM/ECF registration. Letter and Order Granting PHV Motion mailed to Counsel Tucker (TLO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Kelly Iverson re CM/ECF registration. Letter and Order Granting PHV Motion mailed to Counsel Iverson (TLO)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel R. Bruce Carlson re CM/ECF registration. Letter and Order Granting PHV Motion mailed to Counsel Carlson. (TLO)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 #8 #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. Bruce Carlson, Kelly Iverson, Kevin Tucker for Melissa Hill. Acknowledgments of PHV Order due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/25/2018. (TLO)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION Kevin Tucker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2213865.) Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiff Melissa Hill (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kevin Tucker, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cossi, Domenic)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION Kelly Iverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2213857.) Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiff Melissa Hill (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kelly Iverson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cossi, Domenic)
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION R. Bruce Carlson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2213847.) Domenic A. Cossi appearing for Plaintiff Melissa Hill (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of R. Bruce Carlson, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cossi, Domenic)
October 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 10/16/2018 (MMS)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Saundra Kilgore, Paralegal for LuLaRoe, LLC on 09/25/2018, filed by Melissa Hill. (Cossi, Domenic)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Saundra Kilgore, Paralegal for LLR, Inc. d/b/a LuLaRoe on 09/25/2018, filed by Melissa Hill. (Cossi, Domenic)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Judy Crowder, Executive Assistant for LuLaRoe, LLC on 09/24/2018, filed by Melissa Hill. (Cossi, Domenic)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Class Action Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial served on Judy Crowder, Executive Assistant for LLR, Inc. d/b/a LuLaRoe on 09/24/2018, filed by Melissa Hill. (Cossi, Domenic)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Original issued Summonses mailed to Counsel Cossi. (SLR)
September 13, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2194444. (SLR)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by Melissa Hill. (Attachments: #1 Blank Summons - LLR, #2 Blank Summons - LULAROE, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. LLR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Hill
Represented By: Maxwell E. Kirchhoff
Represented By: Domenic A. Cossi
Represented By: Kevin Tucker
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Represented By: Kelly Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LULAROE
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Randolph T. Moore
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Steven T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LLR
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Randolph T. Moore
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Steven T. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?