Horn v. K&K Trucking et al
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Horn
Defendant: Peter Barber and K&K Trucking
Case Number: 4:2018cv00123
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: A preliminary pretrial conference was held on Wednesday, November 14, 2018. After discussion the Court adopts the joint discovery plan. Upon the agreement of the parties, the following schedule shall apply: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris, Jury Trial set for 1/13/2020 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. **SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES.** Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/14/2018. (ACC)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John Johnston: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 11/14/2018. (Law Clerk: B. Hammer), (SLL)
November 9, 2018 Reset Hearings: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2018 at 03:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. (SLR)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order: Preliminary Pretrial Conference is RESET for 11/14/2018 at 03:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/8/2018. (MMS) Modified on 11/9/2018 to correct Judge that will conduct PPTC. (SLR).
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Peter Barber, K&K Trucking. (Gratton, Scott)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Peter Barber, K&K Trucking. (Gratton, Scott)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Peter Barber, K&K Trucking. (Gratton, Scott)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Sandra J. Horn. (Joos, Brian)
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by K&K Trucking. (Gratton, Scott)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Consent to the jurisdiction of the United States Magistrate Judge having been withheld or met with objection, this case remains assigned to Honorable Brian Morris, United States District Judge and referred to Honorable John Johnston, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/10/2018. (ACC)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER; Pursuant to the Parties Stipulation to Vacate the Courts 9-19-18 Order, and for good cause: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for October 24, 2018 is VACATED and RESET BY TELEPHONE for Wednesday, November 14, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. The Joint Discovery Plan, Stipulated Facts and Preliminary Pretrial Statements are due to the Court on November 7, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/1/2018. (TLO)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Vacate Court's Order of 9-19-18 by K&K Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Gratton, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on shelf in Great Falls Clerk's Office. (ACC)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal documents received from MT Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons 5/17/18 - K&K Trucking & Peter Barber, #4 Summons returned unserved - K&K Trucking, #5 Summons returned unserved - Peter Barber, #6 Issued Summonses 7/2/18) (ACC)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/17/2018. Joint Discovery Plan due by 10/17/2018. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/17/2018. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 02:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/19/2018. (SLR)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Mailed to counsel Scott G. Gratton, Adam M. Shaw, Brian Joos. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/9/2018. (ACC)
September 19, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2196809 (ACC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K&K Trucking. (ACC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Peter Barber, K&K Trucking. (ACC)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from MT Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number ADV-18-282. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. K&K Trucking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Barber
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Represented By: Adam M. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&K Trucking
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Represented By: Adam M. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra J. Horn
Represented By: Brian Joos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?