United States of America v. Swingley et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Alger W. Swingley and Glacier County
Case Number: 4:2019cv00009
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Alger W. Swingley. (Francis, Victoria)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alger W. Swingley. (ACC)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Glacier County waiver sent on 2/6/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Francis, Victoria)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Francis, Victoria)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Glacier County on February 6, 2019 by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Alger Swingley on February 6, 2019 by United States of America. (Francis, Victoria)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Swingley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alger W. Swingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glacier County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?