Suda et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al

Plaintiff: Ana Suda and Martha Hernandez
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan, John Does 1-25, United States Customs and Border Protection and Paul O'Neal
Case Number: 4:2019cv00010
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Jadwat, Omar)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda re #8 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Wofsy, Cody)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines: Paul O'Neal answer due 5/6/2019. (SLR)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines: Kevin K. McAleenan answer due 4/22/2019. (SLR)
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines: United States Customs and Border Protection answer due 4/22/2019. (SLR)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (Rate, Alexander)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 2/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service) (Rate, Alexander)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Proof of Service filed by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. Service by Physical on 3/5/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service, #2 Exhibit Return of service) (Rate, Alexander)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 Remark: Attorney Omar Jadwat is now a registered user. (MMS)
March 5, 2019 Remark: Cody Wofsy is now a registered electronic CM/ECF user. (SLR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Wofsy re CM/ECF registration. Letter and Order #8 mailed to Counsel Wofsy (TLO)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Jadwat re CM/ECF registration. Letter and Order #8 mailed to Counsel Jadwat (TLO)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 #5 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Omar C. Jadwat and Cody H. Wofsy for plaintiffs Martha Hernandez and Ana Suda; Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/4/2019. (TLO)
February 26, 2019 Remark: Elizabeth Ehret is now a registered CM/ECF user. (SLR)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #4 MOTION Omar C. Jadwat to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265228.) by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. (Rate, Alexander)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #5 MOTION Cody Wofsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265233.) by Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda. (Rate, Alexander)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Cody Wofsy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265233.) Alexander H. Rate appearing for Plaintiffs Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV PO) (Rate, Alexander)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Omar C. Jadwat to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2265228.) Alexander H. Rate appearing for Plaintiffs Martha Hernandez, Ana Suda (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Rate, Alexander)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Elizabeth K. Ehret re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Ehret. (ACC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kevin K. McAleenan, Paul O'Neal, United States Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Originals mailed to Alex Rate) (ACC)
February 14, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2264527 (ACC)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive Relief and Request for Jury Trial against All Defendants, filed by Ana Suda, Martha Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suda et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Suda
Represented By: Danielle Ann Rand Coffman
Represented By: Alexander H. Rate
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Ehret
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hernandez
Represented By: Danielle Ann Rand Coffman
Represented By: Alexander H. Rate
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Ehret
Represented By: Cody H. Wofsy
Represented By: Omar C. Jadwat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?