Norman v. State of Montana, DNRC Land Board et al

Plaintiff: Ross A Norman
Defendant: State of Montana, DNRC Land Board, Lazy K-6 Ranch, United States Department of Interior, Jon Raby, Bureau of Land Management and David L. Bernhardt
Case Number: 4:2019cv00013
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for the Federal and State Defendants to file an answer or other responsive pleading is extended until September 6, 2019 and that the case is otherwise administratively stayed until the date. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/1/2019. (MMS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Victoria L. Francis appearing for Defendants David L. Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Jon Raby, United States Department of Interior (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Francis, Victoria)
March 15, 2019 Set Deadlines: David L. Bernhardt answer due 4/22/2019; Bureau of Land Management answer due 4/22/2019; Jon Raby answer due 4/22/2019; United States Department of Interior answer due 4/22/2019. (SLR)
March 15, 2019 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando on shelf in Great Falls Clerk's Office. (SLR)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND/OR QUIET TITLE (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Ross A Norman. (SLR)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND/OR QUIET TITLE (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Ross A Norman. (SLR)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Twelfth Judicial District Court, County of Chouteau, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 Doc. 8 ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Lazy K-6 Ranch Inc., #2 Doc. 7 -Request for Entry of Default, #3 Doc. 6 Notice of Removal, #4 Doc. 5 - Affidavit of Service, #5 Doc. 4 - Affidavit of Service, #6 Doc. 3 - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt) (SLR)
March 14, 2019 Remark: Counsel Lisa Semansky is now a registered CM/ECF user. (SLR)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: On March 13, 2019, Defendants State of Montana, Department of Natural Resources and Conservation ("DNRC") and the Board of Land Commissioners ("Land Board") through counsel (hereinafter, collectively "State") submitted a #7 motion requesting a 40-day extension of the deadline to file the State's Answer to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Rule 6(b)(1)(A), F.R.Civ.P., for good cause, and with no objection from opposing counsel, the State's Motion is GRANTED. The State shall have until April 22, 2019 to respond to the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Copy to Counsel Semansky. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/13/2019. (SLR)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Mark Phares appearing for Defendant State of Montana, DNRC Land Board (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Phares, Mark)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Semansky re CM/ECF registration - SECOND NOTICE. Letter mailed to Counsel Semansky. (SLR)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Federal Defendants have filed an #3 unopposed motion seeking an additional 40 days to file an Answer or other appropriate responsive pleading. The current deadline to file is March 13, 2019. With good cause appearing; IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for the Federal Defendants to file an Answer or other responsive pleading is extended until April 22, 2019. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel Semansky. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/12/2019. (SLR)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 4/25/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 4/25/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 4/25/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 03:00 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/12/2019. (TLO) Modified on 3/13/2019 to reflect copy of PPTC Order mailed to Counsel Semansky. (SLR).
March 12, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Victoria L. Francis appearing for Defendants David L. Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Jon Raby, United States Department of Interior (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Francis, Victoria)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Counsel Lisa Swan Semansky re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Semansky. (SLR)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Defendants from Twelfth Judicial District Court, Chouteau County, Case Number DV-19-04. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint (State Court), #2 Issued Summones - Federal Defendants, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. State of Montana, DNRC Land Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana, DNRC Land Board
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Represented By: Mark Phares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazy K-6 Ranch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Raby
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Represented By: Victoria L. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross A Norman
Represented By: Lisa Swan Semansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?