Schuler v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Kippy Schuler
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Wal-Mart Stores Inc.'s Associates Health and Welfare Plan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00026
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kippy Schuler. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston waiver sent on 4/24/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Stalpes, Justin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.'s Associates Health and Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Wal-Mart) Originals mailed to counsel Stalpes for service (TLO)
April 1, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 0977-2286674 (TLO)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.'s Associates Health and Welfare Plan, filed by Kippy Schuler. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Liberty, #2 Summons - Wal-mart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuler v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.'s Associates Health and Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kippy Schuler
Represented By: Justin P. Stalpes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?