Dixon v. Mountain View Pizza Company et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Dixon
Defendant: Allison Mohler, Rick Mohler and Mountain View Pizza Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00037
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Brandon Dixon re #4 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #5 Letter (Leniski, Joe)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Remark: Attorney Joe Leniski is a registered user. (MMS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Dixon. Rick Mohler waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Dixon. Mountain View Pizza Company waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Fitzpatrick, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Dixon. Allison Mohler waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Fitzpatrick, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 CM/ECF Registration letter from Clerk of Court mailed to counsel Joe P. Leniski, Jr. (LJM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joe P. Leniski, Jr for Brandon Dixon. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/8/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/21/2019. Copy mailed to Counsel Leniski (LJM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Joe P. Leniski, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 26HTB0GP.) John M. Fitzpatrick appearing for Plaintiff Brandon Dixon (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joe P. Leniski, Jr., #2 Certification Joe P. Leniski, Jr., #3 Text of Proposed Order Allowing Joe P. Leniski Jr., to appear pro hac vice) (Fitzpatrick, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allison Mohler, Rick Mohler, Mountain View Pizza Company. (Originals mailed to Cnsl Fitzpatrick) (ACC)
May 20, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2311973 (TLO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brandon Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Mountain View Pizza Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Mohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain View Pizza Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Dixon
Represented By: John M. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Joe P. Leniski, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?