Haney v. Brenntag North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather M. Haney
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings LLC, Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Imerys USA, Inc., Shulton Inc, Cyprus Mines Corporation, American Cyanamid Company, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., The Procter and Gamble Company, Allied-Signal, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Wyeth Holdings Corporation, Brenntag North America, Inc. and Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00040
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 131 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled action and any and all claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice and that each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees.) (Huey, Nathan) Modified on 6/21/2021 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #129 Stipulated Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., are dismissed from this case with prejudice, with Plaintiff and Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. to each bear her or its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/22/2021. (MMS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 129 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon) Modified on 3/22/2021 to change event into a stipulated motion (MMS).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING NEW TRIAL DATE. Pursuant to the Agreed #127 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and for New Trial Date, the following remaining deadlines are set as follows: All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions shall be filed and fully briefed on or before: 8/5/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/3/2021. (ACC)
March 3, 2021 Filing 127 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and for New Trial Date Nathan A. Huey appearing for Defendant Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Huey, Nathan)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to the #125 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-entitled action and any and all claims of Plaintiff against Defendants The Procter and Gamble Company; Shulton, Inc.; and Wyeth Holdings, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice and that each party shall bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/24/2021. (SLR)
February 24, 2021 Filing 125 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Patrick R. Watt appearing for Defendants Shulton Inc, The Procter and Gamble Company, Wyeth Holdings LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Watt, Patrick)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., f/k/a Allied-Signal. Inc., is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/21/2021. (MMS)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER OF DISMISSAL regarding #122 Stipulated Motion as to Cyprus Mines Corporation. Each parties shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/21/2021. (MMS) Modified on 1/21/2021 to add text as to defendant that is dismissed (MMS).
January 13, 2021 Filing 122 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Auerbach, Daniel) Modified on 1/13/2021 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR).
January 13, 2021 Filing 121 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary) Modified on 1/13/2021 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND SETTING NEW TRIAL DATE: Pursuant to the Agreed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and for New Trial Date, the following remaining deadlines are set as follows: All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions shall be filed and fully briefed on or before: May 7, 2021 Proposed final pretrial order: June 23, 2021 Trial briefs, jury instructions due: July 6, 2021 Final Pretrial Conference: July 15, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Jury Trial: July 26, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. All other provisions of the scheduling order #114 remain the same. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/17/2020. (TLO)
December 17, 2020 Filing 119 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order and for New Trial Date Nathan A. Huey appearing for Defendant Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Amend scheduling order and set a new trial date) (Huey, Nathan)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Pursuant to the #117 Stipulated Motion for Clarification, the following remaining deadlines are also extended as follows: All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions shall be filed and fully briefed on or before February 8, 2021; Proposed Final Pretrial Order 3/25/2021; Trial briefs, jury instructions due 4/6/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/14/2020. (SLR)
September 14, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION to Clarify Daniel J. Auerbach appearing for Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Auerbach, Daniel)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TEXT Order Vacating. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion hearing and status conference set for October 22, 2020 are VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/17/2020. (SLL)
July 21, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick R. Watt on behalf of The Procter and Gamble Company (Watt, Patrick)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING THIRD STIPULATION MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER AND REQUEST FOR NEW TRIAL DATE. Pursuant to the Third Stipulation Modifying Scheduling Order and Request for New Trial Date, the following deadlines shall apply to discovery in this matter, in place of the deadlines set in the same order and then re-set by the second Stipulation Modifying Scheduling Order [102): Fact Discovery cut off August 27, 2020 Disclose all liability experts and Plaintiffs damages experts September 28, 2020 Disclose Defendants damages experts October 8, 2020 Disclose rebuttal experts (all parties) October 22, 2020.Discovery closes December 8, 2020. Additionally, based on the Stipulation of the parties, the current trial date is vacated and the matter is now set for trial commencing April 13, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. The Final Pretrial Conference is RESET for April 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Both will be held at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/14/2020. (TLO)
May 14, 2020 Filing 113 STIPULATION Modifying Scheduling Order by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Auerbach, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2020 to change event into a pending motion (MMS).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #111 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Nathan A. Huey for Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/7/2020. (MMS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Scott G. Gratton appearing for Defendant Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Gratton, Scott)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying #103 Motion to Quash. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/21/2020. (MMS)
April 21, 2020 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Hollar on behalf of Johnson & Johnson (Hollar, Stephanie)
April 20, 2020 Filing 108 RESPONSE to Motion re #103 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Case Register) (Hollar, Stephanie)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. may have until April 20, 2020 to file any opposition to the #103 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/14/2020. (SLR)
April 14, 2020 Filing 106 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add word "unopposed". (SLR).
April 9, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Honeywell International, Inc. re #99 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Dorfman, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 104 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #103 MOTION to Quash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit-copy of subpoena) (AMC)
March 27, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION TO QUASH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA in re Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Attorney Tyler Dugger, Tolliver Law Firm P.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (AMC)
March 24, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/9/2020. Deadlines were reset pursuant to Stipulation #102 filed on 3/24/2020 and pursuant to chambers. (MMS)
March 23, 2020 Filing 102 STIPULATION Modifying Scheduling Order by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon)
March 9, 2020 Filing 101 Remark: Attorney Daniel Dorman is now a registered user. (MMS)
February 28, 2020 Filing 100 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Daniel Dorfman re: CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Dorfman. (SLR)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Honeywell's #98 Motion to allow Mr. Dorfman to appear on its behalf is GRANTED on the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINE. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel Dorfman. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/28/2020. (SLR)
February 28, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION Daniel A. Dorfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2449280.) Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel A. Dorfman, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
February 27, 2020 Filing 97 Remark: Attorney Robert Baum is now a registered user. (MMS)
February 19, 2020 Filing 96 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Robert Baum re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Baum. (ACC)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER: Defendant, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. (WCD) have moved for admission of Robert Baum (Mr. Baum), (Doc. 94), to practice before this Court in this case with Scott G. Gratton of Brown Law Firm, P.C. to act as local counsel. Mr. Baum's application appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). WCD's #94 motion to allow Mr. Baum to appear on its behalf is GRANTED. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/19/2020. (ACC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION Robert Baum to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2444665.) Catrina V. MacIntyre appearing for Defendant Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (MacIntyre, Catrina)
January 23, 2020 Filing 93 STIPULATION by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon) Modified on 1/28/2020 to remove that this doc was changed to a stipulated motion - per Chambers. (SLR).
January 17, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Honeywell International, Inc. (Reaven, Elliot)
January 9, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Honeywell International, Inc. re #86 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Barnes, Aurora)
January 9, 2020 Remark: Attorney Elliot Reaven is now a registered electronic CM/ECF user. (ACC)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Stipulated Motion. The Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete Fact Discovery from February 7, 2020 to March 24, 2020 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/2/2020. (MMS)
January 2, 2020 Filing 89 Stipulated Motion TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE FACT DISCOVERY Albert Oganesyan appearing for Plaintiff Heather M. Haney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Oganesyan, Albert)
January 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 3/24/2020. (MMS)
December 19, 2019 Filing 88 Letter from from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Elliott Reaven re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Reaven. (ACC)
December 19, 2019 Filing 87 Letter from from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Aurora Barnes re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Barnes. (ACC)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. has moved for an order allowing Elliott J. Reaven, Esq. and Aurora Temple Barnes, Esq. to appear pro hac vice in this case with Gary Zadick, Esq., designated as local counsel. The applications of Mr. Reaven and Ms. Barnes appear to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's #83 and #84 motions to allow Mr. Reaven and Ms. Barnes to appear on its behalf are GRANTED, subject to the following conditions: **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/19/2019. (Order mailed to Cnsl Reaven and Barnes) (ACC)
December 18, 2019 Filing 85 SUPPLEMENT re #84 MOTION Elliott J Reaven to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2416498.), #83 MOTION Aurora Temple Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2416484.) by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Zadick, Gary)
December 18, 2019 Filing 84 MOTION Elliott J Reaven to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2416498.) Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Elliott J. Reaven, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
December 18, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION Aurora Temple Barnes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2416484.) Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aurora Temple Barnes, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
August 15, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Honeywell International, Inc. re 80 Remark, #77 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,, (Plachy, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Honeywell International, Inc. (Hudgens, Benjamin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 80 Remark: Attorney Michael Plachy is now a registered user. (MMS)
August 12, 2019 Remark: Attorney Benjamin Hudgens is now a registered user. (ACC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 79 Letter from from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Benjamin Hudgens re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Hudgens. (ACC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 78 Letter from from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Michael Plachy re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Plachy. (ACC)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: Defendant, Honeywell International, Inc. has moved for an order allowing Michael D. Plachy, Esq. and Benjamin W. Hudgens, Esq. to appear pro hac vice in this case with Gary Zadick, Esq., designated as local counsel. The applications of Mr. Plachy and Mr. Hudgens appear to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d).IT IS ORDERED: Honeywell's #75 and #76 motions to allow Mr. Plachy and Mr. Hudgens to appear on its behalf are GRANTED. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/9/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Cnsl Plachy & Cnsl Hudgens) (ACC)
August 9, 2019 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION Benjamin W. Hudgens to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2350185.) Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Benjamin W. Hudgens in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION Michael D. Plachy to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2350177.) Gary M. Zadick appearing for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael D. Plachy in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Zadick, Gary)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Status Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 2/7/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 9/18/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/31/2019. (MMS)
July 31, 2019 Filing 73 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 7/31/2019. (Law Clerk: J. Brown), (SLL)
July 24, 2019 Filing 72 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon)
July 24, 2019 Filing 71 Notice of Correction: re 69 Plaintiff's Rule 26 Initial Disclosure. The filing error relates to: Discovery. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 70 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Heather M. Haney. Amendment to #65 Preliminary Pretrial Statement . (Oganesyan, Albert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 69 Plaintiff's Amended Rule 26 Initial Disclosure. (Oganesyan, Albert) Modified on 7/24/2019 to correct title of document. (SLR).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #25 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #28 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/23/2019. (SLL)
July 22, 2019 Filing 67 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Shulton Inc, The Procter and Gamble Company, Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Wilson, Mark)
July 22, 2019 Filing 66 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Heather M. Haney. (Oganesyan, Albert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 65 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Heather M. Haney. (Oganesyan, Albert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 64 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Heather M. Haney. (Oganesyan, Albert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 63 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Zadick, Gary)
July 22, 2019 Filing 62 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Auerbach, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 61 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gratton, Scott)
July 22, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Jury Trial by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Gratton, Scott)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #50 Stipulated Motion. Defendant Brenntag Specialties, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/18/2019. (MMS)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #48 Stipulated Motion. Defendant Brenntag North America, Inc. is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/18/2019. (MMS)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 Motion and WCD is not dismissed from the above-captioned matter. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Plaintiff will file an amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, removing WCD from the Notice of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2019. (MMS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION of Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Scott G. Gratton appearing for Defendant Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gratton, Scott)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: Upon Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss #54 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is WITHDRAWN. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that Defendant, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc. will file a Motion of Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #43 , pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), on or before July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/9/2019. (MMS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (Gratton, Scott)
July 8, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Heather M. Haney (Oganesyan, Albert)
July 5, 2019 Filing 52 Notice of Correction: re #49 Objection. The filing error relates to: Caption. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 51 Notice of Correction: re #48 Stipulated Motion , and #50 Stipulated Motion . The filing error relates to: Caption. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (SLR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 50 Stipulated Motion Jon M. Moyers appearing for Plaintiff Heather M. Haney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moyers, Jon)
July 3, 2019 Filing 49 Objection re: #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss on Jurisdictional Grounds. (Gratton, Scott)
July 3, 2019 Filing 48 Stipulated Motion Jon M. Moyers appearing for Plaintiff Heather M. Haney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moyers, Jon)
July 3, 2019 Remark: Albert Oganesyan is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (SLR)
June 25, 2019 Filing 47 CM/ECF Registration Letter from Clerk of Court, Tyler Gilman, regarding Order #46 granting admission of PHV Attorney Albert Oganesyan (TLO) Modified on 6/25/2019 to reflect letter and order mailed to cnsl Oganesyan (TLO).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Albert Oganesyan for Heather M. Haney. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/25/2019. (TLO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION Albert Oganesyan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2328415.) Jon M. Moyers appearing for Plaintiff Heather M. Haney (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Moyers, Jon)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER re #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Heather M. Haney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties that are a party to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal will file a stipulation of dismissal and proposed order on or before July 5, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/14/2019. (SLL)
June 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Heather M. Haney (Moyers, Jon)
June 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief in Response to Order due by 7/5/2019, pursuant to Text Order 44 . (MMS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wyeth Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer, Inc. for Wyeth Holdings LLC.. (Pfennigs, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shulton Inc identifying Corporate Parent Procter & Gamble Company for Shulton Inc.. (Pfennigs, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Procter and Gamble Company. (Pfennigs, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER re #38 Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will conduct the pretrial conference BY TELEPHONE on July 31, 2019. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/11/2019. (SLL)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER; Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/22/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/22/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/10/2019. (TLO)
June 10, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Shulton Inc, The Procter and Gamble Company, Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Wilson, Mark)
June 10, 2019 Case transferred in from Billings Division on 06/06/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-42. (ACC)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Change Venue. This case shall be transferred to the Great Falls Division pursuant to Local Rule 1.2(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/6/2019. (JDR)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention, #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention Responses due by 6/14/2019. Replies due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Cavan on 6/6/2019. (JDR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention, #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention, #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention Jon M. Moyers appearing for Plaintiff Heather M. Haney (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Moyers, Jon) Modified on 6/11/2019 to remove text regarding referral to Judge Cavan (MMS).
June 5, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Heather M. Haney re #8 MOTION to Change Venue (Moyers, Jon)
May 31, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon)
May 30, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Zadick, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brenntag North America, Inc.. (Gratton, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 29 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention filed by Brenntag North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gratton, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention Scott G. Gratton appearing for Defendant Brenntag North America, Inc. (Gratton, Scott) Modified on 6/10/2019 to remove language that motion is referred to Judge Cavan (MMS).
May 23, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brenntag Specialties, Inc.. (Gratton, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 26 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention filed by Brenntag Specialties, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gratton, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention Scott G. Gratton appearing for Defendant Brenntag Specialties, Inc. (Gratton, Scott) Modified on 6/10/2019 to remove language that motion is referred to Judge Cavan (MMS).
May 23, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Gratton, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention filed by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Gratton, Scott)
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Request for Abstention Scott G. Gratton appearing for Defendant Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Gratton, Scott) Modified on 6/10/2019 to remove language that motion is referred to Judge Cavan (MMS).
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Zadick, Gary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Wyeth Holdings LLC on May 1, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Whittaker Clark & Daniels, inc. on May 2, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Shulton, Inc. on May 1, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Procter & Gamble on April 30, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Johnson & Johnson on May 1, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. on May 1, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Honeywell International, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Cyprus Mines Corporation on May 1, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Brenntag Specialties on May 1, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Brenntag North America on April 30, 2019, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Moyers, Jon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Change Venue Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. Motions referred to Timothy J. Cavan. (Davis, Maxon)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Auerbach, Daniel)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Cyprus Mines Corporation. (Auerbach, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. of Extension for Removal (Gratton, Scott)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Cypres Mines Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Shulton Inc, The Procter and Gamble Company, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC. Originals sent via US Mail to plaintiff's counsel. (JEC)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons, #7 summons, #8 summons, #9 summons, #10 summons) (Moyers, Jon)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Imerys USA, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Shulton Inc, The Procter and Gamble Company, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Wyeth Holdings LLC. (Originals mailed to J. Moyers.) (JDR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Heather M. Haney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JDR)
April 16, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2294343 (JDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney v. Brenntag North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings LLC
Represented By: Patrick R. Watt
Represented By: Robert B. Pfennigs
Represented By: Mark T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag Specialties, Inc.
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Aurora Temple Barnes
Represented By: Michael D. Plachy
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Represented By: Elliot J. Reaven
Represented By: Daniel A. Dorfman
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hudgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shulton Inc
Represented By: Patrick R. Watt
Represented By: Robert B. Pfennigs
Represented By: Mark T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Auerbach
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cyanamid Company
Represented By: Patrick R. Watt
Represented By: Robert B. Pfennigs
Represented By: Mark T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Catrina V. MacIntyre
Represented By: Robert Baum
Represented By: Nathan A. Huey
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter and Gamble Company
Represented By: Patrick R. Watt
Represented By: Robert B. Pfennigs
Represented By: Mark T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Aurora Temple Barnes
Represented By: Michael D. Plachy
Represented By: Gary M. Zadick
Represented By: Elliot J. Reaven
Represented By: Daniel A. Dorfman
Represented By: Benjamin W. Hudgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephanie A. Hollar
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Patrick R. Watt
Represented By: Robert B. Pfennigs
Represented By: Mark T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral Pigment Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Scott G. Gratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M. Haney
Represented By: Albert Oganesyan
Represented By: Jon M. Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?