Walker v. Windy Boy et al
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Walker
Defendant: Jessica Windy Boy, Chippewa Cree Tribe and Rocky Boy Health Clinic
Case Number: 4:2019cv00043
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald J. Walker. Chippewa Cree Tribe served on 7/18/2019. (ACC)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 Mailing of Consent Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Evan M.T. Thompson. Mailed via USPS to Ronald Walker.Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 9/6/2019. (ACC)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Chippewa Cree Tribe, Rocky Boy Health Clinic, Jessica Windy Boy. Amendment to #10 Brief/Memorandum in Support, of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Failure to Exhaust Tribal Remedies, and Inapplicability of Federal Statutes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jessica Windy Boy, #2 Exhibit Chippewa Cree Tribal Law and Order Codes) (Thompson, Evan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to Exhaust Tribal Remedies, and Inapplicability of Federal Statutes filed by Chippewa Cree Tribe, Rocky Boy Health Clinic, Jessica Windy Boy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Jessica Windy Boy, #2 Exhibit Chippewa Cree Tribal Law and Order Codes) (Thompson, Evan)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Failure to Exhaust Tribal Remedies, and Inapplicability of Federal Statutes Evan M.T. Thompson appearing for Defendants Chippewa Cree Tribe, Rocky Boy Health Clinic, Jessica Windy Boy Motions referred to John Johnston. (Thompson, Evan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Defendants, having respectfully filed an #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, and good cause appearing therefor; IT IS ORDERED that Defendants have up to and including Friday, August 16, 2019 to file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Order mailed to pro se Plaintiff Walker. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/1/2019. (SLR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Evan M.T. Thompson appearing for Defendants Chippewa Cree Tribe, Rocky Boy Health Clinic, Jessica Windy Boy Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time) (Thompson, Evan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re: #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment - 1, #2 Attachment - 2, #3 Attachment - 3) (ACC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to Walker (TAG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Agreement to Allow Pro Se Party to File by E-Mail. Mailed to Walker (TAG) (
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint. Mailed to Walker with docket sheet (Attachments: #1 NOTICE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS AND CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE) (TAG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Se Request for Leave to File by E-mail by Ronald J. Walker. (TAG)
June 21, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number MTX4-13699 (TAG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Ronald J. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Windy Boy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Windy Boy
Represented By: Michael L. Rausch
Represented By: Evan M.T. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chippewa Cree Tribe
Represented By: Michael L. Rausch
Represented By: Evan M.T. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Boy Health Clinic
Represented By: Michael L. Rausch
Represented By: Evan M.T. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?