Northern Plains Resource Council et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth, Bold Alliance, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club, Natural Resources Defense Council and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: LT. General Todd T. Semonite and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Intervenor Defendant: TC Energy Corporation and TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv00044
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' #34 joint motion for an extension of time for Federal Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors to file their responsive pleadings. Having considered the motion, and good cause being shown, the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are to file their planned amended complaint no later than September 10, 2019. Federal Defendants shall respond to the forthcoming amended complaint no later than October 1, 2019. Defendant-Intervenors shall file their responsive pleading no later than October 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/27/2019. (ACC)
August 22, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading Benjamin James Grillot appearing for Defendants Todd T. Semonite, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Grillot, Benjamin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP re #31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Whitfield, Peter)
August 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP re #31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Steenland, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Peter R. Steenland; granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Peter C. Whitfield. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 8/29/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/14/2019. (MMS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Grillot on behalf of All Defendants (Grillot, Benjamin)
August 13, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofor R. Swanson on behalf of Todd T. Semonite, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (Swanson, Kristofor)
August 8, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Friends of the Earth, Bold Alliance, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Northern Plains Resource Council, Natural Resources Defense Council. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 7/5/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Bechtold, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP re #24 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, #26 MOTION Peter C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 26J76E58.), #25 MOTION Peter R. Steenland to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 26J76ARR.) (Oven, Jeffery)
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION Peter C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 26J76E58.) Jeffery J. Oven appearing for Intervenor Defendants TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Whitfield PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Whitfield PHV) (Oven, Jeffery)
August 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION Peter R. Steenland to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 26J76ARR.) Jeffery J. Oven appearing for Intervenor Defendants TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Steenland PHV, #2 Text of Proposed Order Steenland PHV) (Oven, Jeffery)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant-Intervenors' #22 Motion to Admit Peter R. Steenland Pro Hac Vice, and #23 Motion to Admit Peter C. Whitfield Pro Hace Vice are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/1/2019. (SLR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION Peter C. Whitfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2345323.) Jeffery J. Oven appearing for Intervenor Defendants TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Whitfield, #2 Text of Proposed Order Whitfield PHV) (Oven, Jeffery)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION Peter R. Steenland to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2345319.) Jeffery J. Oven appearing for Intervenor Defendants TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Steenland, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order PHV Steenland) (Oven, Jeffery)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP. (Roth, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #18 motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that TransCanada Keystone Pipeline, LP and TC Energy Corporation shall file their answer or dispositive motion in response to the complaint within seven days of the Federal Defendants' filing of an answer or dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/23/2019. (ACC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Intervene filed by TC Energy Corporation, TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP. (MMS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene Jeffery J. Oven, Mark L. Stermitz, Jeffrey M. Roth appearing for Interested Parties TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP, TC Energy Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MMS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club for Amy R. Atwood (Atwood, Amy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club for Jared M. Margolis (Margolis, Jared)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club re #10 Order,, (Huber, Eric)
July 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club re #10 Order,, (Hayes, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bold Alliance, Natural Resources Defense Council re #10 Order,, for Cecilia D. Segal (Segal, Cecilia)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club re #10 Order,, (Prange, Jaclyn)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Doug Hayes, Eric Huber, Jackie Prange, Cecelia Segal, Jared Margolis, and Amy Atwood re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel. (MMS)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER re #9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Doug Hayes ; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Huber ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jackie Prange ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cecelia Segal ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jared Margolis ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amy Atwood. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/23/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/8/2019. (Copy of order mailed to counsel) (MMS) Modified on 7/8/2019 to reflect all attorneys are registered users, NEF was regenerated to counsel and not mailed (MMS).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Doug Hayes ; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Eric Huber ; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jackie Prange ; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cecelia Segal ; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jared Margolis ; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amy Atwood. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/23/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/8/2019. (Copy of order mailed to counsel) (MMS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Amy Atwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2333689.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Atwood affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Jared Margolis to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2333688.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Margolis Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Cecelia Segal to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2333446.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Segal affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION Jackie Prange to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2333439.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Prange affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION Eric Huber to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900013874.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Huber affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Doug Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number MTX900013874.) Timothy M. Bechtold appearing for Plaintiffs Bold Alliance, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Hayes Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 1, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2331547 (ACC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Originals mailed to Cnsl Bechtold. (ACC)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Friends of the Earth, Bold Alliance, Sierra Club, Center for Biological Diversity, Northern Plains Resource Council, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Plains Resource Council et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bold Alliance
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Represented By: Cecilia D. Segal
Represented By: Jared Michael Margolis
Represented By: Eric E. Huber
Represented By: Douglas P. Hayes
Represented By: Amy R. Atwood
Represented By: Jaclyn H. Prange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Plains Resource Council
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. General Todd T. Semonite
Represented By: Benjamin James Grillot
Represented By: Kristofor R. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Benjamin James Grillot
Represented By: Kristofor R. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TC Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Peter R. Steenland
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Represented By: Mark L. Stermitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: TransCanada Keystone Pipeline LP
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Roth
Represented By: Peter R. Steenland
Represented By: Jeffery J. Oven
Represented By: Peter Christopher Whitfield
Represented By: Mark L. Stermitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?