Stidham v. Saul
Plaintiff: Diana B Stidham
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00054
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons USM 285 Return Executed on 09/05,09,16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipts, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking) (Kampfer, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. Original given back to Cnsl at clerks counter (ACC)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Stidham may proceed with this action in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, without payment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/21/2019. (TLO)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Diana B Stidham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (MMS) Modified on 8/21/2019 to remove LODGED (TLO).
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Robert M. Kampfer appearing for Plaintiff Diana B Stidham. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stidham v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana B Stidham
Represented By: Robert M. Kampfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?