Lee v. Foundation Energy Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee
Defendant: Foundation Energy Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00083
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Amy C. McNulty, Michael A. Josephson, Caitlin Boland Aarab, Lindsay R. Itkin. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 2/18/2020. (ACC)
January 28, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foundation Energy Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Foundation Energy Company, LLC for Foundation Energy Management, LLC.. (McNulty, Amy)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference setfor March 11, 2020 is VACATED and RESET for Wednesday, March 18, 2020at 11:00 a.m. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/28/2020. (TLO)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 3/5/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 3/5/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 3/5/2020. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 11:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Magistrate Judge John Johnston. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/21/2020. (MMS)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Foundation Energy Management, LLC. (McNulty, Amy)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Christopher Lee (Itkin, Lindsay)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Christopher Lee (Josephson, Michael)
December 19, 2019 Remark: Counsel Michael Josephson and Counsel Lindsay Itkin are now registered CM/ECF electronic users. (SLR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Lindsay R. Itkin re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Itkin. (SLR)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's #6 Motion to allow Ms. Itkin to appear on its behalf is GRANTED on the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINE. Copy of Order mailed to Counsel Itkin. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/13/2019. (SLR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Lindsay R. Itkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2414315.) Caitlin Boland Aarab appearing for Plaintiff Christopher Lee Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Lindsay Itkin, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Aarab, Caitlin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to Pro Hac Vice Counsel Josephson re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Josephson. (ACC)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff has moved for admission of Michael A. Josephson (Mr. Josephson), to practice before this Court in this case with Caitlan Boland Aarab, Esq. of Boland Aarab, PLLP to act as local counsel. Mr. Josephson's application appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). Plaintiff's #3 motion to allow Mr. Josephson to appear on it's behalf is GRANTED on the following conditions: SEE ORDER OR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 12/9/2019. (ACC) Modified on 12/9/2019 to reflect copy mailed to Cnsl Josephson (ACC).
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Michael A. Josephson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2410614.) Caitlin Boland Aarab appearing for Plaintiff Christopher Lee Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (Aarab, Caitlin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Foundation Energy Management, LLC. (Original mailed to counsel) (MMS)
December 2, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2407726. (MMS)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Foundation Energy Management, LLC, filed by Christopher Lee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Foundation Energy Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foundation Energy Management, LLC
Represented By: Amy C. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lee
Represented By: Caitlin Boland Aarab
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Lindsay R. Itkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?