Marquis Cattle Company v. Murdock et al
Plaintiff: Marquis Cattle Company
Defendant: Gary L. Spielman and Chuck Murdock
Case Number: 4:2019cv00087
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Chuck Murdock. (Heitz, Casey)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chuck Murdock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Heitz, Casey)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Casey Heitz appearing for Defendant Chuck Murdock Motions referred to John Johnston. (Heitz, Casey)
February 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Chuck Murdock answer ddl. (ACC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial served on Chuck Murdock on 1-25-2020, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Evenson, Kirk)
January 16, 2020 Set Deadlines: Gary L. Spielman answer ddl. (ACC) Modified on 2/11/2020 to edit text(ACC).
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial served on Gary L. Spielman on January 15, 2020, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Evenson, Kirk)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Chuck Murdock, Gary L. Spielman. (ACC)
December 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2416828 (ACC)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chuck Murdock, Gary L. Spielman, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquis Cattle Company v. Murdock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Spielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Murdock
Represented By: Casey Heitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Cattle Company
Represented By: Kirk D. Evenson
Represented By: Amber L. Henning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?