Adams v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Francis C. Adams, Northern Montana Hospital and Northern Montana Hospital d/b/a Northern Montana Care Center
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv00054
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Great Falls Office
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Northern Montana Hospital, #14 Order on Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #10 is GRANTED in regard to the original state court case Northern Montana Hospital, d/b/a Northern Montana Care Center v. Francis C. Adams, DV-20-026, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. The caption in this case should be amended as follows: FRANCIS C. ADAMS, Plaintiff v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Defendant. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/20/2020. (MMS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 RECEIPT CONFIRMATION. Case received by Hill County District Court on 8/12/20. (ACC)
August 10, 2020 Remark: Original State Court documents, 1-CD containing documents filed in U.S. District Court and a copy of docket mailed to Hill County Clerk of Court. (ACC)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's #10 Motion to Remand is GRANTED, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/10/2020. (ACC)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Francis C. Adams. (Bechtold, Timothy)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Leman on behalf of Northern Montana Hospital (Leman, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Northern Montana Hospital. (Gould, Gregory)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Gregory G. Gould appearing for Plaintiff Northern Montana Hospital, Counter Defendant Northern Montana Hospital (Gould, Gregory)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Northern Montana Hospital. (Gould, Gregory)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Northern Montana Hospital. (Gould, Gregory)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Northern Montana Hospital (Gould, Gregory)
July 2, 2020 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando folder on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (SLR)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Northern Montana Hospital. (SLR)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Montana Twelfth Judicial District Court, Hill County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Issued Summons, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Letter - Motion for Extension, #5 Order Grant Extension, #6 Letter - Motion for Extension, #7 Brief in Response to Motion for Extension, #8 Order Extending Deadline to Answer, #9 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (SLR)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Northern Montana Hospital by Francis C. Adams. (Bechtold, Timothy)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America, and U.S. Attorney General. Original Summonses mailed to Counsel Bechtold (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons - AG) (SLR)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Francis C. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Summons clerk, #2 Summons AG) (Bechtold, Timothy)
June 26, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2501746. (SLR)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Francis C. Adams from Twelfth Judicial District Court, Hill County, case number DV-20-026. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Complaint, #3 Service of Process, #4 Order on Extension, #5 Docket Sheet, #6 Counsel of Record, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis C. Adams
Represented By: Timothy M. Bechtold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Montana Hospital
Represented By: Lucas R. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Montana Hospital d/b/a Northern Montana Care Center
Represented By: Lucas R. Hamilton
Represented By: Gregory G. Gould
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Leman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?