Western Organization of Resource Councils et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Northern Plains Resource Council, Sierra Club, Wildearth Guardians, Center for Biological Diversity and Powder River Basin Resource Council
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor Defendant: State of Wyoming
Case Number: 4:2020cv00076
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Luther L. Hajek appearing for Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hajek, Luther)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Withholding Consent. Consent to the jurisdiction of the U.S. Magistrate Judge having been either withheld or met with objection, this case remains ASSIGNED to the Honorable Brian Morris. The referral is TERMINATED and the Honorable Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2020. (ACC)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 Mailing of Consent - Honorable John Johnston as Presiding Judge. Electronically mailed to counsel Shiloh Silvan Hernandez, Melissa Anne Hornbein, Nathaniel Shoaff, Travis S. Jordan, Luther L. Hajek, Mark Steger Smith, Jean E. Williams. Consent/Objection to USMJ Form due by 10/19/2020. (ACC)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther L. Hajek on behalf of All Defendants (Hajek, Luther)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Defendant-Intervenor State of Wyoming. (TLO)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER; Wyomings Motion to Intervene as a Defendant-Intervenor is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Wyomings Proposed Answer as a separate docket entry and amend the case caption to recognize Wyomings presence in the case as a Defendant-Intervenor. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/1/2020. (TLO)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by State of Wyoming. (ACC)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene Travis S. Jordan appearing for Interested Party State of Wyoming. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Answer, #3 Proposed Unopposed Motion Elliott Adler Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Declaration of Elliott Adler, #5 Text of Proposed Order - Pro Hac Vice Elliott Adler) (ACC)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nathaniel Shoaff for Sierra Club. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/24/2020. (TLO)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Nathaniel Shoaff to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2548411.) Shiloh Silvan Hernandez appearing for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Montana Environmental Information Center, Northern Plains Resource Council, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Wildearth Guardians Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Shoaff, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hernandez, Shiloh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Montana Environmental Information Center, Northern Plains Resource Council, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Wildearth Guardians. (Hernandez, Shiloh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Proof of Service filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Montana Environmental Information Center, Northern Plains Resource Council, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Sierra Club, Western Organization of Resource Councils, Wildearth Guardians. Service by Mail to U.S Agency on 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed / Proof of Service Upon U.S. Defendant - BLM, #2 Proof of Service Upon U.S. Attorney Dist. MT, #3 Proof of Service Upon U.S. Attorney General) (Hernandez, Shiloh)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (MMS) (Original e-mailed to counsel)
August 27, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2533723 (MMS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant, filed by Western Organization of Resource Councils, Montana Environmental Information Center, Powder River Basin Resource Council, Wildearth Guardians, Sierra Club, Northern Plains Resource Council, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Blank Summons) (MMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Organization of Resource Councils et al v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Environmental Information Center
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Organization of Resource Councils
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Plains Resource Council
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Represented By: Nathaniel Shoaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wildearth Guardians
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Powder River Basin Resource Council
Represented By: Melissa Anne Hornbein
Represented By: Shiloh Silvan Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Mark Steger Smith
Represented By: Jean E. Williams
Represented By: Luther L. Hajek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Wyoming
Represented By: Travis S. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?