Calumet Montana Refining v. Wheeler
Plaintiff: Calumet Montana Refining
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler
Case Number: 4:2021cv00007
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Daniel W. Pinkston appearing for Defendant Andrew R. Wheeler (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Pinkston, Daniel)
February 13, 2021 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit served on Leif Johnson on 01/10/2021, filed by Calumet Montana Refining. (Faure, Jean)
February 13, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit served on Andrew Wheeler on 02/10/2021, filed by Calumet Montana Refining. (Faure, Jean)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Calumet Montana Refining re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, Leann Johnson Koch (Faure, Jean)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Calumet Montana Refining re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, Jonathan G. Hardin (Faure, Jean)
February 8, 2021 Remark: Jonathan Hardin is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (ACC)
February 8, 2021 Remark: LeAnn Johnson Koch is now a registered EM/ECF electronic user. (SLR)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 Letters from Clerk of Court, Tyler Gilman, to PHV Counsel Koch and Counsel Hardin re CM/ECF registration. Letters mailed to Counsel Koch and Hardin (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel Hardin) (TLO)
February 5, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Andrew R. Wheeler answer due 3/29/2021. (SLR)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Proof of Service filed by Calumet Montana Refining. Service by Certified Mail on 01/27/2021. (Faure, Jean)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney LeAnn Johnson Koch,Jonathan G. Hardin for Calumet Montana Refining.; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney LeAnn Johnson Koch,Jonathan G. Hardin for Calumet Montana Refining. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/19/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/4/2021. (TLO)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan G. Hardin ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2611950.) Jean E. Faure appearing for Plaintiff Calumet Montana Refining (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Faure, Jean)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Leann Johnson Koch and Jonathan G. Hardin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2611938.) Jean E. Faure appearing for Plaintiff Calumet Montana Refining (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Faure, Jean)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Pinkston on behalf of Andrew R. Wheeler (Pinkston, Daniel)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Calumet Montana Refining. (Faure, Jean)
January 20, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2603274. (SLR)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against all Defendants, filed by Calumet Montana Refining. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calumet Montana Refining v. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew R. Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel W. Pinkston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calumet Montana Refining
Represented By: Jean E. Faure
Represented By: Jason T. Holden
Represented By: Jonathan G. Hardin
Represented By: LeAnn Johnson Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?