Moniz v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Moniz
Defendant: Montana State Board of Health, Department of Public Health and Human Services, Department of Labor and Industry, Montana State Department of Health, BNSF Railway Company, Does A-Z, Robinson Insulation Company and State of Montana
Case Number: 4:2021cv00077
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Remark: All documents in case and a copy of docket sheet mailed to Eighth Judicial Court on a CD. (ACC)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: THIS MATTER, having come before THE COURT and after consideration, Defendant BNSF Railway Company's #5 Unopposed Motion to Remand is GRANTED. This case is hereby remanded back to the Asbestos Claims Court of the State of Montana, Cascade County. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/21/2021. (ACC)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Remand Anthony Michael Nicastro appearing for Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Nicastro, Anthony)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Remark: Original State Court Documents provided in electronic format, no hard copies kept in clerks office. (MMS)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (STATE COURT) against All Defendants.. (MMS)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from the Asbestos Claims Court of the State of Montana, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Notice of Order Approving Settlement and of Dismissal With Prejudice of SOM, #3 Issued Summons, #4 Answer, #5 Request for Statement of Damages, #6 Statement of Claims, #7 Motion to Compel, #8 Notice of Filing Removal) (MMS)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BNSF Railway Company from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number DDV-18-0022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)
June 16, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0977-2684082. (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moniz v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana State Board of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor and Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana State Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Nadia H. Patrick
Represented By: Anthony Michael Nicastro
Represented By: Chad M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Moniz
Represented By: Ross Thomas Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?