King v. United Teacher Associates Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelle King
Defendant: United Teacher Associates Insurance Company, Continental General Insurance Company, Great American Life Insurance Company, Continental LTC and Does I-V
Case Number: 4:2021cv00087
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Remark: Attorney Nicole Wixted is now a registered user. (ACC)
September 23, 2021 Remark: Pro Hac Vice Counsel Sandra K. Jones is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (SLR)
September 22, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel B. Bidegaray (Bidegaray, Daniel)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule, established with the concurrence of the parties, will be observed: All amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties on or before: 1/21/2022. Discovery shall close on: 11/3/2022. All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions, shall be filed and fully briefed on or before: 12/4/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/2/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2023 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/15/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS** (ACC)
September 15, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY Telephonic Pretrial Conference held on 9/15/2021. (Law Clerk: C. Clevidence), (SLL)
September 14, 2021 Filing 26 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Nicole C. Wixted re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Wixted (TLO)
September 14, 2021 Filing 25 Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court, to PHV Counsel Sandra K. Jones re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Jones (TLO)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for attorney Sandra K. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #23 Motion for attorney Nicole C. Wixted to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 9/29/2021. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/14/2021. (TLO)
September 14, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION Nicole C. Wixted to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2727605.) Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, Great American Life Insurance Company, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicole C. Wixted, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon)
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION Sandra K. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 262 receipt number 0977-2727595.) Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, Great American Life Insurance Company, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sandra K. Jones, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon)
September 8, 2021 Filing 21 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, Great American Life Insurance Company, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company. (Davis, Maxon)
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT Order Granting #16 Stipulated Motion filed by Great American Life Insurance Company, Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Doc. 12 is WITHDRAWN. The Motion hearing set for September 30, 2021 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/8/2021. (SLL)
September 7, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION Withdrawing Plaintiff's Motion for Default, etc. by Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, Great American Life Insurance Company, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company. (Davis, Maxon) Modified on 9/8/2021 to change event to "stipulated motion". (SLR).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION for Entry of Default against Great American Life Insurance : Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 at 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 9/2/2021. (SLL)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Maxon R. Davis on behalf of Great American Life Insurance Company (Davis, Maxon)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default against Great American Life Insurance filed by Michelle King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B- Summons) (Bidegaray, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default against Great American Life Insurance Daniel B. Bidegaray appearing for Plaintiff Michelle King (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bidegaray, Daniel)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company. (Davis, Maxon)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint on United Teachers Associates Insurance Co. served on Jane Henderson, RA on July 1, 2021, filed by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint on Continental LTC, Inc., fka Continental Insurance, Inc. served on Aaliyah Wamsley on June 28, 2021, filed by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint on Great American Life Insurance Co. served on Jane Henderson, RA on July 1, 2021, filed by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint to Continental General Insurance Co. served on Jane Henderson, RA on 7/1/2021, filed by Michelle King. (Bidegaray, Daniel)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDERPreliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/8/2021. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/8/2021. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/8/2021. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/3/2021. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** (ACC)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Defendants have moved for an extension of time, to and through, August 18, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise plead, in response to Plaintiff's Complaint, the #4 motion being unopposed, and the relief requested being reasonable,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants may have to and through August 18, 2021, within which to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's #3 Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/3/2021. (ACC)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Continental General Insurance Company, Continental LTC, Great American Life Insurance Company, United Teacher Associates Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Maxon)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Michelle King. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (SLR)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Issued Summons - all Defendants) (SLR)
August 2, 2021 Remark: Original State Court documents placed in brown expando file on back shelf in Clerk's Office. (SLR)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Teacher Associates Insurance Company, Great American Life Insurance Company, Continental LTC, Continental General Insurance Company from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, case number ADV-18-0601. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR)
July 28, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 0977-2704270. (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. United Teacher Associates Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle King
Represented By: Daniel B. Bidegaray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Teacher Associates Insurance Company
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Represented By: Nicole C. Wixted
Represented By: Sandra K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental General Insurance Company
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Represented By: Nicole C. Wixted
Represented By: Sandra K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Represented By: Nicole C. Wixted
Represented By: Sandra K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental LTC
Represented By: Maxon R. Davis
Represented By: Nicole C. Wixted
Represented By: Sandra K. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?