Burns v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Kaylee R. Burns and Dawn R. Burns
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 4:2022cv00039
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Phillips on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Phillips, Jacob)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. Counsel is directed to download and print Summons for service. (SLR)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Kilolo Kijakazi, re #2 Complaint (Rasmusson, Eric)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Appear in forma pauperis. Bums may proceed with this action in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, without payment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/21/2022. (TLO)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Kaylee R. Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (SLR) Modified on 4/21/2022 to remove "Lodged" (TLO).
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis: Eric Rasmusson appearing for Plaintiff Kaylee R. Burns (Attachments: #1 IFP Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylee R. Burns
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn R. Burns
Represented By: Eric Rasmusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Jacob Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?