Wright et al v. Shelby Distributors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jon Q Wright and JQ Licensing, LLC
Defendant: Robert Curtiss d/b/a CURTISS SERVICE CENTER and Shelby Distributors, LLC d/b/a EAGLE BEVERAGE
Case Number: 4:2024cv00100
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Kathleen L DeSoto
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2024 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (APP)
December 30, 2024 Filing 13 Submission of Proposed Summons as to Robert Curtiss, Shelby Distributors, LLC, re #1 Complaint (Lapin, Dmitry)
December 30, 2024 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Robert Curtiss d/b/a Curtiss Service Center, filed by JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright. (Lapin, Dmitry)
December 30, 2024 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to Shelby Distributors LLC, filed by JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright. (Lapin, Dmitry)
November 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John Johnston no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/22/2024. (APP)
November 19, 2024 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert Curtiss on November 19, 2024 by JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright. Waiver of Service due by 12/19/2024. (Lapin, Dmitry)
November 19, 2024 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Shelby Distributors LLC on November 19, 2024 by JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright. Waiver of Service due by 12/19/2024. (Lapin, Dmitry)
November 19, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright re #6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Lapin, Dmitry)
November 19, 2024 Terminate Deadlines as to #6 Acknowledgement Pro Hac. (ACC)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dmitry Lapin. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found #here. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 11/29/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 11/14/2024. (KJC)
November 14, 2024 Filing 5 AO 121 Copyright form transmitted to the U.S. Copyright Office. (Black, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION Dmitry Lapin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 273 receipt number AMTDC-3369100.). Michael G. Black appearing for Plaintiffs JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dmitry Lapin, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Black, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING ERRATA EXHIBIT A TO COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Ex. A - Action Series Registration Certificate) (Black, Michael) Modified on 11/15/2024 to clean up text(ACC).
November 14, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure/Notice of Interested Parties by JQ Licensing, LLC, Jon Q Wright identifying Other Affiliate JQ Licensing, LLC for Jon Q Wright. (Black, Michael)
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shelby Distributors, LLC, Robert Curtiss, filed by Jon Q Wright, JQ Licensing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJC)
November 14, 2024 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3368792 (KJC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Shelby Distributors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Q Wright
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: Dmitry Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JQ Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Michael G. Black
Represented By: Dmitry Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Curtiss d/b/a CURTISS SERVICE CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Distributors, LLC d/b/a EAGLE BEVERAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?