Reinhardt v. BNSF Railway Company et al

Plaintiff: Mitchell Reinhardt
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Montana Human Rights Bureau, Montana Department of Labor and Industry and Montana Human Rights Commission
Case Number: 6:2010cv00027
Filed: May 21, 2010
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Charles C. Lovell
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Remand. MHRC final agency decision is Reversed and Remanded to the MHRC for further proceedings consistent with this Order and Opinion and Order 30 . Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 4/4/2016. (MKB)
February 6, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: granting Petition for Judicial Review, REVERSING final agency decision, and REMANDING to Montana Human Rights Commission for further proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED: Respondent BNSF shall pay reasonable atty fees/costs to Petitioner's counsel, who shall submit bill of costs/fees to opposing counsel. Clerk to notify Montana Human Rights Commission of entry of this Opinion & Order. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 2/6/2012. (MKB)
December 17, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Remand; denying 12 Motion to Remand; DISMISSING Respondents Montana Human Rights Bureau, Montana Department of Labor and Industry, and Montana Human Rights Commission. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 12/17/2010. (MKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reinhardt v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Reinhardt
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Human Rights Bureau
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Labor and Industry
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Human Rights Commission
Represented By: Michelle T. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?