Pearson v. Pausha
Plaintiff: Oliver Emanuel Pearson
Defendant: Larry Pausha
Case Number: 6:2010cv00035
Filed: June 25, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Molloy
Presiding Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER. The Court finds that Mr. Pearson's Notice of Appeal is not frivolous, he should be allowed to continue in forma pauperis on appeal, and the 92 request to obtain transcripts at government expense is granted. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 11/29/2011. Mailed to Pearson. (TAG, )
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying 55 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 53 Subpoena Request filed by Oliver Emanuel Pearson. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 10/7/2011. Mailed to Pearson. (TAG, )
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Serve Subpoenas; denying 45 Motion for Continuance. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/29/2011. Mailed to Pearson. (TAG, )
September 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/19/2011. Mailed to Pearson with docket and subpoena forms as directed. (TAG, ) Modified on 9/20/2011 to correct filing date (TAG, ).
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER adopting Findings and Recommendations re 37 Findings and Recommendations; denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 28 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/30/2011. (dle) Modified on 8/30/2011: mailed to Pearson (TAG, ).
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE 5 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; Order Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s). The Findings and Recommendation in this matter are rejected. The Court requests Defendant Pasha to waive service of summons by executing, or having counsel execut e, the Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order; if executed, an answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b), this matter is referr ed to Magistrate Judge Strong. Waiver of Service due by 10/18/2010, Notice of Appearance due by 11/15/2010. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 9/13/2010. Mailed to Pearson. Documents forwarded to Counsel for MDOC as directed. (TAG, ) Modified on 9/13/2010 to correct docket text (TAG, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Pausha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver Emanuel Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Pausha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?