ASARCO v. British Petroleum et al
Plaintiff: ASARCO
Defendant: British Petroleum and American Chemet Corporation
Case Number: 6:2012cv00053
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER denying 330 Motion in Limine; denying 334 Motion in Limine to the extent that the Court views them as superfluous. The Court will resolve questions of foundation, relevancy, and potential prejudice at the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/2/2021. (ASG)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER: that before the close of business on Tuesday, February 2, 2021, each party shall file its respective witness list. Each list shall indicate whether the witness will appear in-person or by Zoom. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/29/2021. (ASG)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDERED: Atlantic Richfields Motion to Enter Judgment (Doc. 314) is DENIED, and ASARCOs Motion for Leave to Supplement Complaint (Doc. 315) is GRANTED. ASARCO may file the proposed pleading currently lodged at Document 316-1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat, at 9:00 a.m. on February 4, 2021 at the Russell Smith Federal Courthouse in Missoula, Montana, the Court will hear evidence on those necessary response costs that have been incurred since trial. See order for additional details and schedule for pre-hearing proceedings. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/19/2020. (HEG)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 IT IS ORDERED: that Atlantic Richfield deposit the original bond and all supporting documentation with the Clerk of Court for safekeeping on or before 12:00 p.m. on Friday, October 19, 2018. Upon the Court's receipt of the original bond and rela ted materials, the motion (Doc. 288) will be GRANTED and this case will be STAYED pending resolution of the Defendant's appeal. IT IS FURTHER ordered that the Clerk of Court shall terminate the pending motion (Doc. 288) upon receipt of the original bond and supporting materials. The Clerk shall not return the bond absent an Order by this Court. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/16/2018. (HEG)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting 271 Motion. The automatic stay of proceedings to enforce or execute the judgment is extended to and including 14 days after the Court decides the amount of attorneys' fees, costs, and interest to which Asarco is entitled. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/10/2018. (ASG)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of ASARCO, LLC against Atlantic Richfield Company. (HEG)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER re pending motions relating to the recent expert disclosures. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/25/2018. (ASG)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER: the parties shall each prepare a notebook including all expert reports of expert witnesses that the party intends to call at trial, and deliver acopy to the Clerk of Court by May 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/10/2018. (ASG)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 212 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting 213 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 1/31/2018. Copy of Order mailed to PHV counsel. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/16/2018. (HEG)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re 107 MOTION to Compel Further Deposition Testimony Regarding Atlantic Richfield's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice filed by Atlantic Richfield Company. Status Report due by 4/2/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/25/2014. (dle)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER re 92 Objection, 93 Objection. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 3/19/2014. (dle)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 41 Motion to join; denying 47 Motion for Hearing; denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/30/2012. (dle)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ASARCO v. British Petroleum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASARCO
Represented By: Gregory Evans
Represented By: William R. Pletcher
Represented By: Stefan T. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: British Petroleum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Chemet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?