Bearchild v. Cobban et al
Plaintiff: Dewayne Bearchild
Defendant: Kristy Cobban, Sgt. Pasha, Sam Jovanovich, Tom Blaz, Dan Johnson and C/O Shashlinge
Case Number: 6:2014cv00012
Filed: March 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: Keith Strong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER denying subject to renewal 306 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/5/2021. (ASG)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDERED: Mr. Pashas motion (Doc. 294) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth previously in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before January 29, 2021, Mr. Bearchild shall serve on Mr. Pasha an amended disclosure of Dr. Evans sufficiently summarizing the facts and opinions on which she is expected testify at trial. See order for complete details and information. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/4/2021. (HEG)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 290 Motion to Object to Defendant's Expert Disclosures. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/9/2020. (ASG)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 276 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Andrew LeGrand for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/14/2020. (ASG)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER ADOPTING ([190, 212 ) FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in part; denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting ( 78 , 82 , 86 , 90 , 194 ) Motions for Summary Judgment; denying ( 166 , 169 ) Motions; granting 139 Motion to Strike. Denise Deyott is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/18/2017. Mailed to Bearchild. (TAG)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER ADOPTING 157 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Bearchild's Objection and Request for Clarification and Reconsideration [121 ], which the Court has construed as amotion to dismiss Blaz, is GRANTED. Blaz is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/21/2016. Mailed to Bearchild. (TAG, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 66 in full; denying 49 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/25/2016. Mailed to Bearchild. (TAG, )
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 39 Motion for TRO and for Preliminary Injunction; granting 41 'Request to Allow to be Excused for Lack of Adequate Copies of Affidavits, due to Lack of Funds to Make Copies'; denying as moot 42 Request to the Court to not be required to post security in regard to motion for a TRO and preliminary injunction ; denying 41 'Request for Immediate Help from this Court.' Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/23/2015. Mailed to Bearchild. (TAG, )
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Bearchild's retaliation claim, to the extent it alleges denial of meals and disciplinary threats as retaliation for utilizing the prison grievance process, shall proceed. All other all egations regarding the verbal harassment, access to the courts, and delay of legal mail, as described in his Complaint 2 , are DISMISSED. Defendant Shashlinge is DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/26/2015. Mailed to Bearchild. (TAG, )
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Motion for Intervention and Sanctions. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/9/2015. Mailed to Bearchild. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bearchild v. Cobban et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Bearchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Cobban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Pasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Blaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Shashlinge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?