Smith v. State of Montana et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Karl Smith
Defendant: State of Montana, Department of Corrections, Montana State Prison, Leroy Kirkegard and Linda Murphy
Case Number: 6:2015cv00013
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER ADOPTING 99 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. Matter DISMISSED. Any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/17/2017. Mailed to Smith. (TAG)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING 90 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; granting 63 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/7/2017. Mailed to Smith. (TAG)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 81 in full; denying without prejudice 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/31/2016. Mailed to Smith. (TAG, )
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 23 in full. Any claim not raised or Defendant not named in the second amended complaint is DISMISSED. Defendant Leroy Kirkegard is DISMISSED. Counsel for the State of Montana shall notify the Court whe ther he will accept service on behalf of Defendants Lambertson, Fossens, and Machler on or before November 6, 2015. If so, Defendants' Answer shall be due on or before November 20, 2015. Motion for default judgment 29 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/30/2015. Mailed to Smith. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. State of Montana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Karl Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Doud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?