Winne v. Knight et al
Plaintiff: Michael Winne
Defendant: Josh Knight, Sargent Weber and Candice Neubaur
Case Number: 6:2015cv00044
Filed: May 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER ADOPTING 76 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; denying 81 Motion. Case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/23/2017. Mailed to Winne (TAG)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 50 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 57 Motion to Compel and Motion for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/20/2017. Mailed to Winne with copy of 57 -1 as directed. (TAG)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Reply; denying 29 , 31 Motions to Supress. The parties shall have 60 days from the date of this Order to conduct discovery as outlined. Within 90 days of the date of this Order, the parties may file supplemental briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/12/2016. Mailed to Winne. (TAG, )
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 39 Motion to File Under Seal, Motions for Substitution 40 , 43 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/7/2016. Mailed to Winne. (TAG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winne v. Knight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Winne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sargent Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Neubaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?