LL Liquor v. State of Montana et al
Plaintiff: LL Liquor
Defendant: State of Montana, Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue, Mike Kadas and John Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 6:2015cv00071
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AMENDED JUDGMENT: Plaintiff LL Liquor, Inc., shall have and is awarded judgment against Defendants State of Montana, Governor Steve Bullock, Montana Department of Revenue, and Director Mike Kadas in the principal amount of $5,000,000.00 USD, plus interest at the rate of 10% per annum from and after October 1, 2019, until the judgment is satisfied. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/1/2021. (HEG)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2019. (HEG)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDERED: Each party shall have to and including November 1, 2019, in which to file a brief in support of its position as to the application of 28 U.S.C. § 1961 to the computation of interest issue before the Court. Optional response briefs may be filed on or before November 8, 2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 10/29/2019. (HEG)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDERED: This order supersedes and replaces paragraphs 5-8 of the Court's June 18, 2019, Order. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2019. See order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/9/2019. (HEG)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDERED: Plaintiffs Motion in Limine is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with L.R. 7. l(c)(l ). Plaintiff may resubmit the motion in proper form. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/31/2019. (HEG)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDERED: The Joint Motion to Amend Briefing and Pretrial Order Deadlines is GRANTED re 32 . All pretrial motions, other than discovery motions, shall be filed and fully briefed on or before 4/3/2017. An attorneys' conference to discuss the final pretrial order preparation on or before: Week of June 12, 2017. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/17/2017. (HEG)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 4 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/29/2015. (HEG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LL Liquor v. State of Montana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LL Liquor
Represented By: Ronald A. Bender
Represented By: Matthew J. Cuffe
Represented By: Jesse C. Kodadek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Montana
Represented By: W. Anderson Forsythe
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bullock
Represented By: W. Anderson Forsythe
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana Department of Revenue
Represented By: W. Anderson Forsythe
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kadas
Represented By: W. Anderson Forsythe
Represented By: Christopher Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?