Stewart v. Kirkegard et al
Plaintiff: Laurence Stewart
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard, Mike Batista, Loraine Wodnik, Paul Szczepaniak, Colleen Ambrose, Thomas Wood, Leonard Mihelish, Thomas Wilson, Mr. Wigert, John Doe 1-37, Mr. Harmon, Connie Wimer, Cathy Redfern, Cindy Hiner, Sam Jovanovich, Billie Rich, Kristy Cobban, Patrick Sheehan, Ronald McDonald, Mr. Wohlman, Mr. Postma, Mr. Kremer, Foster, Jami Eads and Myron Beeson
Case Number: 6:2015cv00084
Filed: September 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: POWELL
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying 180 Application for Bill of Costs; granting 185 MOTION for Transcripts. Clerk shall procure and pay for identified transcripts. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 6/13/2019. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying 181 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law or for New Trial. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/30/2019. Mailed to Lawrence. (TAG)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Sam Jovanovich against Laurence Stewart. Copy mailed to Stewart. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/2019. (HEG)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Jury Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/15/2019. (HEG)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: In light of Mr. Stewart's incarceration status, the names of potential jurors shall not be made available to the parties until the final pretrial conference on April 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 4/10/2019. Copy mailed to Stewart. (ASG)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting as described 119 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 121 Motion to Clarify; denying 122 Motion to Serve Subpoenas; granting in part and denying in part 123 Motion for Subpoenas; granting 126 Motion re Trial Attire; granting 127 Motion for Subpoena. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/22/2019. Mailed to Ellison with blank subpoena form. (TAG) .
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING 92 , 96 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full; denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 91 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/4/2018. Mailed to Stewart (TAG)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; denying 41 Motion to Compel; granting 45 Motion for Protective Order; denying 52 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 54 Moti on to Strike ; denying 56 Motion to Compel; granting 65 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment ( Responses due by 10/27/2017); denying 67 Motion for Sanctions; denying 72 Motion to Strike, but granting motion to file sur-reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 9/25/2017. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 62 Motion for Certificate of Appealability, as construed as a request to certify the issues for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/21/2017. Mailed to Stewart (TAG)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 13 in full. Defendants Leroy Kirkegard, Mike Batista, Loraine W odnik, Paul Szczpaniak, Colleen Ambrose, Connie Wimer, Cathy Redfern, Myron Beeson, Associate Warden Wood, Cindy Hiner, Jami Eads, Sgt. W ahlman, Captain Wigert, Crystal Foster, Sgt. Postma, Unit Manager Kremer, Tom Tutty, Dr. Pirinian, Lt. Harmon, Kristy Cobban, Billie Reich, Patrick Sheehan, Ronald McDonald, Lt. Foster, Leonard Mihelich, Thomas Wilson, John Does 1-7, and John Does 10 -12 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Defendants John Doe 8 and John Doe 9 and the allegations against these Defendants set forth in Count III are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All claims raised in Counts I, II, IV, V, VII, and VIII are DISMISSED WITH P REJUDICE. All claims raised in Count III against Defendants Kirkegard, Batista, Wodnik, Wood, Harmon, and Szcapaniak are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All claims raised in Count VI against Defendants Kirkegard, W odnik, Batista, Beeson, Szczpaniak, and Cobban are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/9/2017. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 26 Motion for Clarification, 29 Motion to Stay. The parties shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to comply with Paragraphs I(A) and I(B) of the Court's February 24, 2017 Scheduling Order 23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/7/2017. Mailed to Stewart. (TAG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart v. Kirkegard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Kirkegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loraine Wodnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Szczepaniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Mihelish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Wigert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-37
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Wimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Redfern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Hiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Jovanovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy Cobban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Wohlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Postma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami Eads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Beeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?