Davis v. Safeway Inc.
Plaintiff: Karen Davis
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Case Number: 6:2016cv00010
Filed: February 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/9/2017. (DED)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDERED: Notwithstanding and in supplement to expert witness disclosures previously made and filed, 1) Expert reports shall be provided from each treating physician who is expected to provide testimony that may include any opinion not fully expressed in the physician's medical records; 2) treating physician expert reports shall be filed and served by Plt on or before 5/26/17; 3) expert reports shall be provided from each non-retained expert identified by Dft and are to be filed and served b y 5/26/17; 4) each treating physician and non-retained expert identified by either party shall file with their respective report all medical records. Please review Order for complete ruling and requirements. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 4/13/2017. (DED) Modified on 4/13/2017 to correct date (DED).
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 15 and 16 Scheduling Orders. Ordered: complete copies of all expert reports shall be served/filed on or before 3/10/17; and, separate written disclosures of all non-retained experts shall be served/filed by 3/10/17. all other matters and deadlines in previous orders remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/6/2017. (DED)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Davis
Represented By: Patrick T. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Kristine J. Beal
Represented By: Robert D. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?