National Association for Gun Rights v. Motl et al
Plaintiff: National Association for Gun Rights
Defendant: Jonathan Motl, Timothy C. Fox and Leo Gallagher
Case Number: 6:2016cv00023
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDERED: The Court's order of September 6, 2017 (Doc. 44) is VACATED to the extent it upholds the constitutionality of the so called "registered voter requirement" of Mont. Code. Ann. § 13-37-203. As to this statutory provision, Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment should have been GRANTED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/23/2019. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (HEG)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's request to withdraw their pending fee motions re 52 . Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/19/2018. (HEG)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDERED that Montana Code Annotated 13-35-225(3) is declared unconstitutional as being violative of the First Amendment and Defendants are hereby permanently enjoined from commencing and prosecuting any actions under MCA 13-35-225(3) re (44 in 6:16-cv-00023-DLC). Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/18/2017. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (DED)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED: Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc 34) is GRANTED; Consolidated Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc 27) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part in accordance with the order; Defendants shall show cause , within 30 days of this Order, why declaratory relief should not be awarded on NAGR's third claim for relief and why a permanent injunction should not be issued. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 9/6/2017. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (HEG)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Affidavit to S.N. for entering attorney information. Copy of order mailed to PHV counsel. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/23/2017. (HEG)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (3) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 6:16-cv-00023-DLC; granting in part and denying in part (3) Motion for Preliminary Injunction in case 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ in accordance with the Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/23/2016. Associated Cases: 6:16-cv-00023-DLC, 6:16-cv-00033-DLC-JTJ (HEG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Association for Gun Rights v. Motl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Association for Gun Rights
Represented By: Matthew G. Monforton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Motl
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C. Fox
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Gallagher
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?