Benson v. McCulloch et al

Plaintiff: Robin Benson
Defendant: Linda McCulloch, Jonathan Motl and Timothy Fox
Case Number: 6:2016cv00097
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: Montana District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: LINCOLN
Presiding Judge: Susan P. Watters
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/22/2017. (NOS)
April 10, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 65(a)(2), the Court hereby issues notice that it is consolidating Benson's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction with a hearing on the merits of Benson's request for a permanent injunction. The Parties have five days from the date of this Order to object. If neither party objects, the Court will issue an order setting a date for a hearing on the merits. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 4/10/2017. (HEG)
February 28, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION AND EXTEND FILING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE BRIEF. Responses due by 3/20/2017. Granting 14 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Robin Benson. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 2/28/2017. (AMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. McCulloch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Benson
Represented By: Matthew G. Monforton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda McCulloch
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Motl
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Fox
Represented By: J. Stuart Segrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?