Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Security Fire Protection et al

Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund, Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund, Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund and Road Sprinkler Fillers Local Union 669 Work Assessments
Defendant: Security Fire Protection, Kevin Briceno and June Briceno
Case Number: 6:2017cv00043
Filed: April 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Helena Office
County: LEWIS & CLARK
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 80 Notice (Other) filed by Security Fire Protection. On or before 2/28/2019, Plaintiff shall file and serve Defendants a Rule 68(a) written notice as to whether the offer is or is not accepted. See Order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 2/15/2019. (JEC)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDERED: Kevin Briceno and June Briceno are liable under the terms of the October 16, 2009, Settlement Agreement for payment of contribution amounts owed, if any, between October 21, 2011, and March 31, 2013, and for associated fees and interest. Trial to establish contribution amounts owing will be set. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/9/2019. (HEG)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDERED: The parties shall meet and confer and provide to the Court, if notpreviously submitted and identified in the record, true and correct copies of the contracts at issue (see order). If documents identified in paragraph 1 have previousl y been submitted and are part of the case record, the parties shall file a notice identifying to the Court the specific docket entries associated with each document. Upon submission of the documents identified in paragraphs 1 and 2, the issue of liab ility, if any, of Defendants Kevin Briceno and June Briceno for unpaid contributions, late fees, and interest owed by Defendant Security Fire Protection, Inc., will be deemed submitted on the record to the Court for decision. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/15/2018. (HEG)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDERED: 1. The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment are DENIED. 2. Parties shall have up to and including September 21, 2018, to file a joint stipulation. (See order for complete details on joint stipulation) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/4/2018. (HEG)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Defendant Bricenos may have up to andincluding May 11, 2018, to file their reply in support of their Motion forSummary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 5/7/2018. (HEG)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 26 is DENIED for failure to comply with L.R. 7.l(d)(l)(A) and (2)(E). Plaintiffs may resubmit the motion andsupporting documents in compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/21/2018. (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund et al v. Security Fire Protection et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Welfare Fund
Represented By: William J. O'Connor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Local 669 UA Education Fund
Represented By: William J. O'Connor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the National Automatic Sprinkler Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: William J. O'Connor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Sprinkler Industry Supplemental Pension Fund
Represented By: William J. O'Connor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Road Sprinkler Fillers Local Union 669 Work Assessments
Represented By: William J. O'Connor, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Fire Protection
Represented By: Craig D. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Briceno
Represented By: Craig D. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Briceno
Represented By: Craig D. Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?