Hunter v. St. Employee: Campbell

Plaintiff: Michael W. Hunter
Defendant: St. Employee: Campbell
Case Number: 6:2019cv00022
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Mailed to Hunter (TAG)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #5 in full. This dismissal counts as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). Any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2019. Mailed to Hunter (TAG)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Hunter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/29/2019. Mailed to Hunter and MSP (TAG)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis granted. Judge Magistrate Judge John Johnston termed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 5/29/2019. Mailed to Hunter (TAG)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Amended Pleading/Account Statement due by 5/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 4/8/2019. Mailed to Hunter with form (TAG)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael W. Hunter. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (TAG)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #1 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Hunter with docket sheet (TAG)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Michael W. Hunter. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. St. Employee: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Employee: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?