McAlpin et al v. Nationstar Mortgage et al

Plaintiff: Dennis McAlpin and Carrie McAlpin
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Nationstar Mortgage
Case Number: 6:2019cv00046
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Charles C Lovell
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: Defendant's "Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference" (Doc. 8) is DENIED. At least one attorney designated as lead counsel for the respective parties shall appear in person before the undersigned on November 13, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom II of the United States Courthouse, 901 Front Street, Helena, Montana to participate in the preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 9/5/2019. (HEG)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference Taylor T. Haywood appearing for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference) (Haywood, Taylor)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 10/29/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 10/29/2019. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Charles C. Lovell. See order for additional information and deadlines. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 7/22/2019. (HEG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Dennis McAlpin, Carrie McAlpin. (HEG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Lewis and CLark County Case Register Report. All original documents retained on open civil shelf. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (HEG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage. (Haywood, Taylor)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Chandler P. Thompson on behalf of Nationstar Mortgage (Thompson, Chandler)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage. (Haywood, Taylor)
July 10, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2335174. (HEG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage from Montana First Judicial District Court, L&C County, case number DDV-2019-714., filed by Nationstar Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAlpin et al v. Nationstar Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage
Represented By: Taylor T. Haywood
Represented By: Chandler P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis McAlpin
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie McAlpin
Represented By: Brian J. Miller
Represented By: Robert Farris-Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?