Hunter v. Montana ST Prison Employees et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Hunter
Defendant: Montana ST Court Employees and Montana ST Prison Employees
Case Number: 6:2019cv00052
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 10/4/2019. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. Filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis due within thirty days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 8/14/2019. Mailed to Hunter with ifp form. (TAG)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Michael W. Hunter. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Montana ST Prison Employees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana ST Court Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montana ST Prison Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?